Harris v. Anthony, et al
Plaintiff: Donna Harris
Defendant: Dr. Dwalia S. South, Dr. Thad Waites, Wheeler Timothy Timbs, III, Sammie R. Rea, Dr. J. Edward Hill, James L. Perry, Edward J. Langton, Dr. Ed. D. Barham, Elayne H. Anthony, Ph.D., Robert J. Moody and Dr. Lucius M. Lampton
Case Number: 3:2020cv00120
Filed: February 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting Unopposed Second Motion #28 for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants' answers are due on or before 5/25/2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 4/22/2020. (dcw)
April 22, 2020 Filing 28 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Elayne H. Anthony, Ph.D., Ed. D. Barham, J. Edward Hill, Lucius M. Lampton, Edward J. Langton, Robert J. Moody, James L. Perry, Sammie R. Rea, Dwalia S. South, Wheeler Timothy Timbs, III, Thad Waites (Miracle-State Gov, Douglas)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting Unopposed Motion #27 for Extension of Time to Answer. Elayne H. Anthony, Ph.D. answer due 4/23/2020; Ed. D. Barham answer due 4/23/2020; J. Edward Hill answer due 4/23/2020; Lucius M. Lampton answer due 4/23/2020; Edward J. Langton answer due 4/23/2020; Robert J. Moody answer due 4/23/2020; James L. Perry answer due 4/23/2020; Sammie R. Rea answer due 4/23/2020; Dwalia S. South answer due 4/23/2020; Wheeler Timothy Timbs, III answer due 4/23/2020; Thad Waites answer due 4/23/2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 3/19/2020. (dcw)
March 18, 2020 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Elayne H. Anthony, Ph.D., Ed. D. Barham, J. Edward Hill, Lucius M. Lampton, Edward J. Langton, Robert J. Moody, James L. Perry, Sammie R. Rea, Dwalia S. South, Wheeler Timothy Timbs, III, Thad Waites (Miracle-State Gov, Douglas)
March 18, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas T. Miracle-State Gov on behalf of Elayne H. Anthony, Ph.D., Ed. D. Barham, J. Edward Hill, Lucius M. Lampton, Edward J. Langton, Robert J. Moody, James L. Perry, Sammie R. Rea, Dwalia S. South, Wheeler Timothy Timbs, III, Thad Waites (Miracle-State Gov, Douglas)
March 6, 2020 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna Harris. Thad Waites served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (Rice, Aaron)
March 6, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna Harris. Wheeler Timothy Timbs, III served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (Rice, Aaron)
March 6, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna Harris. Dwalia S. South served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (Rice, Aaron)
March 6, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna Harris. Sammie R. Rea served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (Rice, Aaron)
March 6, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna Harris. James L. Perry served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (Rice, Aaron)
March 6, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna Harris. Robert J. Moody served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (Rice, Aaron)
March 6, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna Harris. Edward J. Langton served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (Rice, Aaron)
March 6, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna Harris. Lucius M. Lampton served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (Rice, Aaron)
March 6, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna Harris. J. Edward Hill served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (Rice, Aaron)
March 6, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna Harris. Ed. D. Barham served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (Rice, Aaron)
March 6, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna Harris. Elayne H. Anthony, Ph.D. served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (Rice, Aaron)
March 6, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to documents # [3 - 13]. Incorrect event chosen in filing these documents. These documents should have been docketed using the event "Summons Returned Executed". Further, a return on summons should not be filed without the first page, as issued, preceding the return. Attorney is directed to refile these returns properly. (ND)
March 5, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Donna Harris. Amendment to #3 Affidavit of Service of Summon and Complaint served on Elayne H. Anthony, PH.D., in her official capacity as a member of the Mississippi State Board of Health (Rice, Aaron)
March 5, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Dr. Thad Waites, in his official capacity as a member of the Mississippi State Board of Health on 3/3/2020, filed by Donna Harris. (Rice, Aaron)
March 5, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Wheeler Timothy Timbs, III, in his official capacity as a member of the Mississippi State Board of Health on 3/3/2020, filed by Donna Harris. (Rice, Aaron)
March 5, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Dr. Dwalia S. South, in her official capacity as a member of the Mississippi State Board of Health on 3/3/2020, filed by Donna Harris. (Rice, Aaron)
March 5, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Sammie R. Rea, in her official capacity as a member of the Mississippi State Board of Health on 3/3/2020, filed by Donna Harris. (Rice, Aaron)
March 5, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on James L. Perry, in his official capacity as a member of the Mississippi State Board of Health on 3/3/2020, filed by Donna Harris. (Rice, Aaron)
March 5, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Robert J. Moody, in his official capacity as a member of the Mississippi State Board of Health on 3/3/2020, filed by Donna Harris. (Rice, Aaron)
March 5, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Edward J. Langton, in his official capacity as a member of the Mississippi State Board of Health on 3/3/2020, filed by Donna Harris. (Rice, Aaron)
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Dr. Lucius M. Lampton, in his official capacity as a member of the Mississippi State Board of Health on 3/3/2020, filed by Donna Harris. (Rice, Aaron)
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Dr. J. Edward Hill, in his official capacity as a member of the Mississippi State Board of Health on 3/3/2020, filed by Donna Harris. (Rice, Aaron)
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Dr. Ed. D. Barham, in his official capacity as a member of the Mississippi State Board of Health on 3/3/2020, filed by Donna Harris. (Rice, Aaron)
March 5, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Elayne H. Anthony, PH.D., in her official capacity as a member of the Mississippi State Board of Health on 3/3/2020, filed by Donna Harris. (Rice, Aaron)
March 2, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #1 : Court staff inadvertently filed the incorrect complaint. Court staff has replaced the complaint with the correct one.(LAT)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Elayne H. Anthony, Ph.D., Ed. D. Barham, J. Edward Hill, Lucius M. Lampton, Edward J. Langton, Robert J. Moody, James L. Perry, Sammie R. Rea, Dwalia S. South, Wheeler Timothy Timbs, III, Thad Waites. (LAT)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Elayne H. Anthony, Ph.D., Ed. D. Barham, J. Edward Hill, Lucius M. Lampton, Edward J. Langton, Robert J. Moody, James L. Perry, Sammie R. Rea, Dwalia S. South, Wheeler Timothy Timbs, III, Thad Waites ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4220192), filed by Donna Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT) (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/2/2020) (LAT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Anthony, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Dwalia S. South
Represented By: Douglas T. Miracle-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Thad Waites
Represented By: Douglas T. Miracle-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wheeler Timothy Timbs, III
Represented By: Douglas T. Miracle-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sammie R. Rea
Represented By: Douglas T. Miracle-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. J. Edward Hill
Represented By: Douglas T. Miracle-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L. Perry
Represented By: Douglas T. Miracle-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward J. Langton
Represented By: Douglas T. Miracle-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Ed. D. Barham
Represented By: Douglas T. Miracle-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elayne H. Anthony, Ph.D.
Represented By: Douglas T. Miracle-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Moody
Represented By: Douglas T. Miracle-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Lucius M. Lampton
Represented By: Douglas T. Miracle-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Harris
Represented By: Aaron Randall Rice
Represented By: Dean Sterling Kidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?