McWilliams et al v. Byram Crossing Shops, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Karen L. McWilliams and Jerry C. McWilliams
Defendant: John Does 1-10, The Estes Group, Inc. and Byram Crossing Shops, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00123
Filed: February 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Support re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Jerry C. McWilliams, Karen L. McWilliams (Ott, Paul)
April 13, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Byram Crossing Shops, LLC, The Estes Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Tim Lehning, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of John Madden, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Brian Estes)(Conrad, Richard)
April 13, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Byram Crossing Shops, LLC, The Estes Group, Inc. (Conrad, Richard)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY AND CONFERENCE. The Telephonic Case Management Conference set for April 15, 2020 is hereby cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 3/31/20 (Lewis, Nijah)
March 30, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Jerry C. McWilliams, Karen L. McWilliams (Ott, Paul)
March 30, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by Jerry C. McWilliams, Karen L. McWilliams (Ott, Paul)
March 6, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Byram Crossing Shops, LLC.(Conrad, Richard)
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by The Estes Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Commercial Exclusive Lease Listing Agreement)(Brabec, Frank)
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Russell Brabec on behalf of The Estes Group, Inc. (Brabec, Frank)
March 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John Stuart Robinson, Jr on behalf of Byram Crossing Shops, LLC (Robinson, John)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah)
March 2, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #1 Exhibit 3 and 4, Clerk's office has rescanned and replaced to attach the correct pdfs. (PG)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Byram Crossing Shops, LLC, The Estes Group, Inc. from Circuit - Hinds, case number 20-59. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4220382) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Complaint and Summons, #2 Exhibit 2 Commercial Exclusive Lease Listing Agmt., #3 Exhibit 3 Settlement Agmt.- Special Damages, #4 Exhibit 4 State Court File, #5 Joinder, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(cwl) (Attachment 3 replaced on 3/2/2020) (PG). (Attachment 4 replaced on 3/2/2020) (PG). Modified on 3/2/2020 (PG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McWilliams et al v. Byram Crossing Shops, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estes Group, Inc.
Represented By: Clyde X. Copeland, III
Represented By: Frank Russell Brabec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byram Crossing Shops, LLC
Represented By: Richard T. Conrad, III
Represented By: John Stuart Robinson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen L. McWilliams
Represented By: Paul V. Ott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry C. McWilliams
Represented By: Paul V. Ott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?