Saquing v. Mallett et al
Plaintiff: John Milton Saquing
Defendant: Christopher Epps, Ronald Ellzy Woodall, Wexler Medical, Phil Bryant, Pelicia Hall, Gloria Perry, One Un-named Physician, Marshall Fisher, Centurion Medical, One Un-named Director and Jaworski Mallett
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2020cv00182
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Filing 13 Response to #10 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel and #6 Motion, filed by John Milton Saquing. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(ND)
April 23, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Issue and Serve subpoenas, filed by John Milton Saquing. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(ND)
April 23, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint to "join" a defendant, filed by John Milton Saquing. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(ND)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, denying Plaintiff's #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel and #6 Motion. Plaintiff shall file a response consistent with this Order no later than April 29, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 04/15/2020. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 04/15/2020. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff and Premier Supply Link] (CS)
March 30, 2020 Filing 8 Partial MEMORANDUM BRIEF IN SUPPORT of #1 Complaint, filed by John Milton Saquing. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(ND)
March 30, 2020 Filing 7 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138, filed by John Milton Saquing. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(ND)
March 23, 2020 Filing 6 Letter MOTION for a copy of a subpoena form, filed by John Milton Saquing. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed to Plainitff. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 4/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 03/20/2020. (CS)
March 19, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by John Milton Saquing. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND)
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by John Milton Saquing. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND)
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by John Milton Saquing. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(ND)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Phil Bryant, Centurion Medical, Christopher Epps, Marshall Fisher, Pelicia Hall, Jaworski Mallett(Acting Comm. MDOC), One Un-named Director, One Un-named Physician, Gloria Perry, Wexler Medical and Ronald Ellzy Woodall filed by John Milton Saquing. (Attachments: #1 Supporting docs., #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope, #4 Notice of Assignment)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saquing v. Mallett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Epps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Ellzy Woodall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexler Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pelicia Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Un-named Physician
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Un-named Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaworski Mallett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Milton Saquing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?