Helms v. American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Plaintiff: Christopher Helms
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00212
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting Unopposed Motion #6 for Extension of Time to Answer. American Strategic Insurance Corp. answer due 5/18/2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 5/1/2020. (dcw)
April 29, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Second Unopposed Motion for Extension to File Responsive Pleadings) by American Strategic Insurance Corp. (Currie, Edward)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting Unopposed Motion #4 for Extension of Time to Answer. American Strategic Insurance Corp. answer due 5/4/2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 4/15/2020. (dcw)
April 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph W. Gill on behalf of American Strategic Insurance Corp. (Gill, Joseph)
April 14, 2020 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by American Strategic Insurance Corp. (Currie, Edward)
March 30, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Helms. American Strategic Insurance Corp. served on 3/30/2020, answer due 4/20/2020. (Gammill, Toby)
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (ND)
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Strategic Insurance Corp. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid; receipt number 0538-4241160), filed by Christopher Helms. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Helms v. American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Represented By: Edward J. Currie, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph W. Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Helms
Represented By: Toby J. Gammill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?