Evans v. Bulbhead
Plaintiff: Donovan Evans
Defendant: Bulbhead
Case Number: 3:2020cv00324
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Bulbhead. (KNS)
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Donovan Evans to 620 Highway 82 W., Greenwood, MS 38930. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 5/14/2020. (dcw)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donovan Evans. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bulbhead, filed by Donovan Evans.(KNS) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2020: #1 Envelope) (KNS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Bulbhead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donovan Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bulbhead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?