McCaley v. Fillyaw et al
Plaintiff: Cordellra McCaley
Defendant: Carrie Williams, C/O McClain, Officer Hills, Officer Robinson, Fairmond, Officer Martin and Warden James Fillyaw
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2020cv00349
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. (VM)
May 18, 2020 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Mississippi Northern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00063. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Transferring Cause to USDC Southern District of Mississippi; Case Transferred to District of Southern Mississippi via ECF. CASE CLOSED. (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 5/18/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT and Notice of Intent to Continue Lawsuit re #4 Order Setting PSP Deadline. (cb) Modified on 4/22/2020 (cb). [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 5/18/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Filing 7 Declination to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Case Reassigned to Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers. District Judge Debra M. Brown no longer assigned to the case. (cb) Modified on 4/22/2020 (cb). [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 5/18/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #5 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. (cb) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 5/18/2020.]
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 4/13/2020. (cb) (Main Document 5 replaced on 4/13/2020) (cb). [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 5/18/2020.]
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting PSP Deadline: PSP Forms due by 5/9/2020.. Signed by Clerk on 4/9/2020. (cb) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 5/18/2020.]
April 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (cb) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 5/18/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cordellra McCaley. (cb) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 5/18/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT challenging conditions of confinement, Jury Demand,, filed by Cordellra McCaley. (cb) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 5/18/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCaley v. Fillyaw et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Hills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden James Fillyaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cordellra McCaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?