French v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dana M. French, Dana M. Patrick and Dana Marie French
Defendant: Jauregui & Lindsey, LLC, Ocwen USVI Services, LLC, Ocwen Financial Services, Inc., Does 1 through 10, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc. and Ocwen Mortgage Company, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00356
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Ocwen Financial Services, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Mortgage Company, LLC, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc., Ocwen USVI Services, LLC (Rushing, Stevie)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Disclosure due by 7/14/2020 ; Jury Trial set for 7/19/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (Jackson) Wingate before District Judge Henry T. Wingate; Pretrial Conference set for 6/11/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (Jackson) Wingate before District Judge Henry T. Wingate; Discovery due by 2/5/2021; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 7/30/2020 ; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 7/30/2020 ; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 11/6/2020; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 12/7/2020 ; Motions due by 2/19/2021 ; Settlement Conference set for 1/20/2021 02:00 PM in Chambers 6.150 (Jackson) Anderson before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson; ADR Report due by 6/4/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 7/1/2020 (Lewis, Nijah)
June 30, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 6/30/2020. Participants: James Edward Rainer and Stevie F. Rushing. The Court spoke with counsel. Order to be entered. (Lewis, Nijah)
May 26, 2020 Filing 4 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 6/30/2020 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah)
May 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Service of Corporate Disclosure Statement of Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC Disclosure by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Rushing, Stevie)
May 22, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Rushing, Stevie)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC from Circuit Court of Rankin County, MS, case number 61CI1:20-cv-81-JR. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid; receipt number 0538-4279686) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Petition for Emergency Relief, #3 Exhibit C - Compilation of Bankruptcy Pleadings, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Record, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of Joinder and Consent, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: French v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana M. French
Represented By: James Edward Rainer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana M. Patrick
Represented By: James Edward Rainer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Marie French
Represented By: James Edward Rainer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jauregui & Lindsey, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen USVI Services, LLC
Represented By: Stevie F. Rushing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Stevie F. Rushing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Stevie F. Rushing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Stevie F. Rushing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Mortgage Company, LLC
Represented By: Stevie F. Rushing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?