Exxon Mobil Corporation v. Crosby-Mississippi Resources, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Defendant: Theresa Jan Michaels, Lucius Olen Crosby Gammill, Jennifer Lynn Gammill McKay, Lynne Fairchild Harvison, Thomas R. Slough, Stewart Gammill, IV, LLC, Crosby-Mississippi Resources, Ltd., Cassandra B. Torbett, Mark A. Fairchild, Jacqueline W. Reed, Silver Creek Enterprises, LLC, Eldia Lin Pope, Robert Reed Doyle, John M. Fairchild, Jennifer G. McKay, LLC, Sean Marie High Smith, Susan Gay High Williams, Lynn Crosby Gammill, Robert A. Bass, W.P. McMullan, III, Mary George W. McMullan, Sherrill Wilkes High, CMR, LLC, Mildred Owings, Stephen F. High, Mildred Reed Gordon, Stewart Gammill, IV and BankFirst Financial Services
Case Number: 3:2020cv00410
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Referring Judge: Tom S Lee
2 Judge: Robert P Myers
3 Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Cassandra B. Torbett waiver sent on 7/31/2020, answer due 9/29/2020. (Johnson, E.)
August 6, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by William Arthur Whitehead, Jr on behalf of John M. Fairchild, Mark A. Fairchild, Lynne Fairchild Harvison, Theresa Jan Michaels, Eldia Lin Pope (Whitehead, William)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #34 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' answers are due by 10/14/2020. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on August 6, 2020 (King, Steve)
August 4, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Exxon Mobil Corporation (Johnson, E.)
August 4, 2020 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. BankFirst Financial Services waiver sent on 7/7/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Johnson, E.)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker no longer assigned to case Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 8/3/20 (MGB)
August 3, 2020 Parties should include the newly assigned Magistrate Judge's initials RPM on future filings. (MGB)
July 31, 2020 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Sean Marie High Smith waiver sent on 7/23/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Johnson, E.)
July 28, 2020 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Susan Gay High Williams waiver sent on 6/25/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Johnson, E.)
July 23, 2020 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Robert A. Bass waiver sent on 6/25/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Johnson, E.)
July 23, 2020 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Sherrill Wilkes High waiver sent on 6/24/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Johnson, E.)
July 21, 2020 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Robert Reed Doyle waiver sent on 6/24/2020, answer due 8/28/2020. (Johnson, E.)
July 20, 2020 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Eldia Lin Pope waiver sent on 6/24/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Johnson, E.)
July 20, 2020 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Lucius Olen Crosby Gammill waiver sent on 6/23/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Johnson, E.)
July 20, 2020 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Jennifer Lynn Gammill McKay waiver sent on 6/23/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Johnson, E.)
July 20, 2020 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Stewart Gammill, IV waiver sent on 6/23/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Johnson, E.)
July 20, 2020 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Stewart Gammill, IV, LLC waiver sent on 6/23/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Johnson, E.)
July 20, 2020 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Jennifer G. McKay, LLC waiver sent on 6/23/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Johnson, E.)
July 20, 2020 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Lynn Crosby Gammill waiver sent on 6/23/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Johnson, E.)
July 20, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. CMR, LLC waiver sent on 6/25/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Johnson, E.)
July 20, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Crosby-Mississippi Resources, Ltd. waiver sent on 6/23/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Johnson, E.)
July 20, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Stephen F. High waiver sent on 6/24/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Johnson, E.)
July 20, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Mary George W. McMullan waiver sent on 6/24/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Johnson, E.)
July 17, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE by Robert Reed Doyle of Notice of Waiver of Summons as Trustee of the Mariella Hairstone Doyle Family Trust by Exxon Mobil Corporation (Johnson, E.)
July 17, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #15 . Incorrect event chosen in filing this document. This document should have been docketed using the Waiver of Service event under the Service of Process category. Attorney is directed to refile using the correct event. (ND)
July 16, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Stewart Gammill, IV served on 6/30/2020, answer due 7/21/2020. (Johnson, E.)
July 16, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Lynn Crosby Gammill served on 6/30/2020, answer due 7/21/2020. (Johnson, E.)
July 16, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Jennifer Lynn Gammill McKay served on 6/30/2020, answer due 7/21/2020. (Johnson, E.)
July 14, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Theresa Jan Michaels waiver sent on 6/24/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Johnson, E.)
July 14, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Lynne Fairchild Harvison waiver sent on 6/24/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Johnson, E.)
July 14, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. John M. Fairchild waiver sent on 6/24/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Johnson, E.)
July 14, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Mark A. Fairchild waiver sent on 6/25/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Johnson, E.)
July 10, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Mildred Reed Gordon waiver sent on 6/24/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Johnson, E.)
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Mildred Owings waiver sent on 6/24/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Johnson, E.)
July 7, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Robert Reed Doyle waiver sent on 6/29/2020, answer due 8/28/2020. (Johnson, E.)
June 30, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Lucius Olen Crosby Gammill, Lynn Crosby Gammill, Stewart Gammill, IV and Jennifer Lynn Gammill McKay. (ND)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 6/22/2020 (LAT)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Relatedness by Exxon Mobil Corporation (LAT)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert A. Bass, CMR, LLC, Crosby-Mississippi Resources, Ltd., Robert Reed Doyle, John M. Fairchild, Mark A. Fairchild, Lucius Olen Crosby Gammill, Lynn Crosby Gammill, Stewart Gammill, IV, Mildred Reed Gordon, Lynne Fairchild Harvison, Sherrill Wilkes High, Stephen F. High, Jennifer G. McKay, LLC, Jennifer Lynn Gammill McKay, Mary George W. McMullan, W.P. McMullan, III, Theresa Jan Michaels, Mildred Owings, Eldia Lin Pope, Jacqueline W. Reed, Silver Creek Enterprises, LLC, Thomas R. Slough, Sean Marie High Smith, Stewart Gammill, IV, LLC, Cassandra B. Torbett, Susan Gay High Williams ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643059862), filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Master's Order Approving REvised Summary Schedule of Phase 6 CAlculations and Phase 7 Interest for CMR (without CMR's Unjust Enrichment Claim), #2 Exhibit 2- Master's Order Appoving Revised Summary Schedule of Phase 6 Calculations and Phase 7 Interest for Lynn Crosby Gammill, #3 Exhibit 3- Master's Order Approving Summary Schedule of Phase 6 Calculations and Phase 7 Interest for the Trusts, #4 Exhibit 4- Master's Order Approving Summary Schedules of Phase 6 Calculations and Phase 7 Interest for Stewart Gammill IV, Lucien Olen Crosby Gammill and Jennifer Lynn Gammill, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Exxon Mobil Corporation v. Crosby-Mississippi Resources, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Jan Michaels
Represented By: William Arthur Whitehead, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucius Olen Crosby Gammill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Lynn Gammill McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynne Fairchild Harvison
Represented By: William Arthur Whitehead, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas R. Slough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Gammill, IV, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crosby-Mississippi Resources, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassandra B. Torbett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. Fairchild
Represented By: William Arthur Whitehead, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline W. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver Creek Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eldia Lin Pope
Represented By: William Arthur Whitehead, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Reed Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M. Fairchild
Represented By: William Arthur Whitehead, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer G. McKay, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Marie High Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Gay High Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Crosby Gammill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.P. McMullan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary George W. McMullan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherrill Wilkes High
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMR, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mildred Owings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen F. High
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mildred Reed Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Gammill, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BankFirst Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: E. Otis Johnson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?