Nichols v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Betty Nichols
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2020cv00470
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David F. Chermol. David F. Chermol is admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Plaintiff in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 8/6/2020 (AB)
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 First MOTION for David F. Chermol to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4337701) by Betty Nichols (Attachments: #1 Attachment COGS)(Varnado, Mager)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER requiring answer and briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 7/22/2020 (AG)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons - US Attorney General, #2 Summons US Attorney)(LAT)
July 16, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to CASE FLAGS: Incorrect flags selected. Court staff made the necessary changes. (LAT)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4321888), filed by Betty Nichols. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nichols v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Nichols
Represented By: Mager A. Varnado, Jr.
Represented By: David F. Chermol - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?