Wright v. Moore et al
Plaintiff: Dorsyl Wright
Defendant: Sheriff James R. Moore, Kemper County, Mississippi, John Doe 1- 4, Deputy Sheriff Daniel Haggard, Kathy Davis, Deputy Sheriff Allen Griffin, Office of the Sheriff of Kemper County, Mississippi and Deputy Sheriff Eric Scott
Case Number: 3:2020cv00473
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2020 Filing 18 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT against defendants Allen Griffin, Daniel Haggard, Kemper County, Mississippi, James R. Moore, Office of the Sheriff of Kemper County, Mississippi, and Eric Scott. (ASJ)
September 4, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Entry of Default Office of Kemper Co Sheriff by Dorsyl Wright (Attachments: #1 Affidavit attorney affidavit)(Begley, Samuel)
September 4, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Entry of Default Kemper County, MS by Dorsyl Wright (Attachments: #1 Affidavit attorney affidavit)(Begley, Samuel)
September 4, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Eric Scott by Dorsyl Wright (Attachments: #1 Affidavit attorney affidavit)(Begley, Samuel)
September 4, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Entry of Default Daniel Haggard by Dorsyl Wright (Attachments: #1 Affidavit attorney affidavit)(Begley, Samuel)
September 4, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Entry of Default Allen Griffin by Dorsyl Wright (Attachments: #1 Affidavit attorney affidavit)(Begley, Samuel)
September 4, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Entry of Default James A. Moore by Dorsyl Wright (Attachments: #1 Affidavit attorney affidavit)(Begley, Samuel)
August 31, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #11 Scanned document contains blank page(s). Court Staff has replaced with correct PDF. (cwl)
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Dorsyl Wright by Kathy Davis. (Attachments: #1 Afirmative Defenses, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(cwl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2020: #8 Exhibit 7) (cwl). (Main Document 11 replaced on 8/31/2020) (cwl).
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER. After review of docket number #9 , the Court finds that it should be and is hereby sealed pursuant to L.U.Civ.R. 5.2 and 79. The clerk is hereby directed to take the necessary measures to seal this document. Counsel is directed to file a redacted copy of docket number #9 . NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 8/19/2020. (JEJ)
August 19, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #9 Attorney advises that this is an incorrect document attached, and it should be disregarded. It has been correctly refiled as #10 . (PG)
August 18, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by W. David Watkins on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Watkins, W.)
August 18, 2020 Filing 9 ***ERROR***Disregard this entry. NOTICE of Appearance by W. David Watkins on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Watkins, W.) Modified on 8/19/2020 (PG).
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dorsyl Wright. Eric Scott served on 7/28/2020, answer due 8/18/2020. (Begley, Samuel)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dorsyl Wright. James R. Moore served on 7/28/2020, answer due 8/18/2020; Office of the Sheriff of Kemper County, Mississippi served on 7/28/2020, answer due 8/18/2020. (Begley, Samuel)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dorsyl Wright. Kemper County, Mississippi served on 8/10/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Begley, Samuel)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dorsyl Wright. Kathy Davis served on 8/10/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Begley, Samuel)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dorsyl Wright. Daniel Haggard served on 7/28/2020, answer due 8/18/2020. (Begley, Samuel)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dorsyl Wright. Allen Griffin served on 7/28/2020, answer due 8/18/2020. (Begley, Samuel)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kathy Davis, Allen Griffin, Daniel Haggard, Kemper County, Mississippi, James R. Moore, Eric Scott. (LAT)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kathy Davis, Allen Griffin, Daniel Haggard, Kemper County, Mississippi, James R. Moore, Office of the Sheriff of Kemper County, Mississippi, Eric Scott ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4323662), filed by Dorsyl Wright. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Property Schedule)(PG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Moore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff James R. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kemper County, Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1- 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Sheriff Daniel Haggard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Sheriff Allen Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Sheriff of Kemper County, Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Sheriff Eric Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorsyl Wright
Represented By: Samuel L. Begley
Represented By: W. David Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?