Seneca Insurance Company, Inc. v. RREAF Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.
Defendant: Bradford Byram, LLC and RREAF Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00526
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 9 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 11/9/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah)
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Seneca Insurance Company, Inc. by Bradford Byram, LLC, RREAF Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A First Amended Complaint)(Harris, Andrew)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants RREAF Holdings, LLCs and Bradford Byram, LLCs deadline to file an answer or other responsive pleading is extended to October 1, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 9/16/2020 (Lewis, Nijah)
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Bradford Byram, LLC, RREAF Holdings, LLC (Harris, Andrew)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.. RREAF Holdings, LLC served on 9/4/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (Williams, Matthew)
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M. Williams on behalf of Seneca Insurance Company, Inc. (Williams, Matthew)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.. Bradford Byram, LLC served on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020. (Williams, Matthew)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bradford Byram, LLC and RREAF Holdings, LLC. (ND)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bradford Byram, LLC, RREAF Holdings, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4345893), filed by Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MGB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seneca Insurance Company, Inc. v. RREAF Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradford Byram, LLC
Represented By: Andrew S. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RREAF Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Andrew S. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick J. Schepens
Represented By: Matthew M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?