McDonald v. City of Meridian Police Department
Plaintiff: Juantonious McDonald
Defendant: City of Meridian Police Department
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2020cv00534
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 Response to #6 ORDER, filed by Juantonious McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, pro se Plaintiff Juantonious McDonald shall file a response consistent with this Order no later than October 20, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 10/06/2020. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 10/06/2020. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff and Sheriff Billy Sollie] (CS)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #3 Order Opsp2, Acknowledgement filed by Juantonious McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed to Plaintiff. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 9/18/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 08/18/2020. (CS)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Juantonious McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Meridian Police Department, filed by Juantonious McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(KNS) (copies of NEFs and Notice of Assignment mailed to Plaintiff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonald v. City of Meridian Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juantonious McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Meridian Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?