Ford v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Raisa Ford
Defendant: Andrei M. Matthews and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv00546
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: John C Gargiulo
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Tabitha Bandi-Federal Gov on behalf of United States of America (Bandi-Federal Gov, Tabitha)
October 16, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by United States of America.(Paige-Federal Gov, Mitzi)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raisa Ford. United States of America served on 8/21/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. (Nelson, Omar)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney. (cwl)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrei M. Matthews, United States of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 05384350281), filed by Raisa Ford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MGB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrei M. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Tabitha Bandi-Federal Gov
Represented By: Mitzi Dease Paige-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raisa Ford
Represented By: Omar Lamont Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?