Jamison v. King
Petitioner: Andrew Jamison
Respondent: Ron King
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2020cv00552
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER, on or before October 30, 2020, Petitioner shall file a written response consistent with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 10/09/2020. [Copy of Order mailed to Petitioner] (CS)
October 8, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Andrew Jamison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Westlaw, #2 Proposed Writ, #3 Envelope)(ND)
August 19, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Assignment mailed to Plaintiff's current address listed on docket. (LAT)
August 19, 2020 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Tennessee Western; Case Number 2:20-cv-02021. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S MOTION #5 FOR RECONSIDERATION AND TRANSFERRING PETITION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 8/18/2020. (shl) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/19/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE from COA: Writ of Mandamus filed. Notice filed by Petitioner Mr. Andrew Jamison. Petition Received in 6CA: 08/17/2020. COA Case # 20-5942 (jae) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/19/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 11 Pursuant to Admin. Order 2020-31 referral judge reassigned to Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff.(mbm) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/19/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Judge Unassigned 7 added. Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo no longer assigned to case. (agj) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/19/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 10 PRO SE MOTION for Writ by Andrew Jamison. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/19/2020.]
April 2, 2020 Filing 9 PRO SE MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Pro Se petition by Andrew Jamison. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/19/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Submission of Order to Chambers by Staff Attorney, Patricia Dobberstein. Proposed Corrected Order Denying Petitioner's Motion for Reconsideration and Transferring Petition Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). (csf) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/19/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Submission of Order to Chambers by Staff Attorney, Patricia Dobberstein. Proposed Order Denying Petitioner's Motion for Reconsideration and Transferring Petition Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). (csf) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/19/2020.]
February 26, 2020 CLERK'S REFERRAL TO STAFF ATTORNEY. Clerk's review of preliminary matters completed. (csf) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/19/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 2/26/20. (Lipman, Sheryl) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/19/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ron King, filed by Andrew Jamison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 envelope)(jae) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/19/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 5 Pro Se MOTION for Reconsideration by Andrew Jamison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Envelope) 2/25/2020 (jld). [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/19/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 7 Pro Se MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andrew Jamison. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Account Balance, #2 Envelope)(csf) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/19/2020.]
January 13, 2020 ***Staff notes: Order #4 and short form ifp application mailed to petitioner. (jae) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/19/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PETITIONER TO PROPERLY FILE AN IN FORMA PAUPERIS AFFIDAVIT OR PAY THE $5.00 HABEAS FILING FEE. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 1/13/20. (Lipman, Sheryl) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/19/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/19/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Waive Filing Fee by Andrew Jamison. (csf) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/19/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 filed by Andrew Jamison against Ron King. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Administrative Remedy Program 10/8/2019, #2 Exhibit B Administrative Remedy Program 10/25/2019, #3 Exhibit C Administrative Remedy Program 12/19/2019, #4 Exhibit D Inmate Time Sheet, #5 Envelope, #6 Judicial Cards)(csf) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jamison v. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Andrew Jamison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ron King
Represented By: 2241 AUSA - Memphis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?