UNUM Life Insurance Company of America et al v. Willis et al
Plaintiff: Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company and UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Danita Darlene Willis, Deanna Johnson and Deanna John
Case Number: 3:2020cv00559
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company. Deanna John waiver sent on 8/24/2020, answer due 10/23/2020. (Mansfield, Kenna) Modified on 10/1/2020 (VM).
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company. Danita Darlene Willis waiver sent on 8/24/2020, answer due 10/23/2020. (Mansfield, Kenna)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Deanna John, Danita Darlene Willis (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-4353809), filed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Unum Group Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Group Insurance Enrollment Care, #3 Exhibit C - Provident Policy - Application, #4 Exhibit D - Death Certificate, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of Life Insurance Claim, #6 Exhibit F - 04.16.20 letter to Deanna John, #7 Exhibit G - Benefit Election Auth Form, #8 Exhibit H - Employer Statement, #9 Civil Cover Sheet).(VM) Modified on 10/1/2020 (VM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America et al v. Willis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danita Darlene Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deanna Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deanna John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Kenna L. Mansfield, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Kenna L. Mansfield, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?