Merritt v. Casler et al
Plaintiff: Richard Merritt, Jr.
Defendant: Fort Transfer Company, John Does 1-5 and Anthony Casler
Case Number: 3:2020cv00568
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 8 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 11/20/2020 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah)
October 14, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fort Transfer Company (Holland, Drury)
October 14, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Merritt, Jr. Fort Transfer Company served on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020. (Rowley, John)
October 12, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Drury Sumner Holland on behalf of Anthony Casler, Fort Transfer Company (Holland, Drury)
October 12, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Anthony Casler, Fort Transfer Company.(Ellzey, Scott)
October 5, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #3 : Incorrect event chosen. This document should have been docketed as Summons Returned Executed. Also, a return on summons should not be filed without the first page, as issued, preceding the return. Attorney is directed to refile choosing the correct event and including both pages of the Summons as the pdf document. (PKM)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 **ERROR** Disregard this entry. AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on BRAD E KAHLER, Registered Agent for Fort Transfer Company on 09/23/2020, filed by Richard Merritt, Jr. (Rowley, John) Modified on 10/5/2020 (PKM).
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Anthony Casler, Fort Transfer Company. (PG)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, against Anthony Casler, Fort Transfer Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4355867), filed by Richard Merritt, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(PG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merritt v. Casler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fort Transfer Company
Represented By: Drury Sumner Holland
Represented By: Scott Timothy Ellzey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Casler
Represented By: Drury Sumner Holland
Represented By: Scott Timothy Ellzey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Merritt, Jr.
Represented By: John B. (Ben) Rowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?