Copeland v. F.C.I. Yazoo City (Medium) Health Service Department et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth D Copeland
Defendant: F.C.I. Yazoo City (Medium) Food Service Department and F.C.I. Yazoo City (Medium) Health Service Department
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2020cv00585
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Partial Payment of Filing fee made by: Plaintiff Kenneth D Copeland $38.62, receipt number 34643061231, copy of docket entry mailed to plaintiff. (LAT)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in order.; *RESTRICTED* granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 10/2/2020. [Copy mailed to plaintiff and Warden/Authorized Officer of Inmate Accounts, FCI-McDowell] (LDR)
September 23, 2020 Filing 6 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kenneth D Copeland (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MGB)
September 23, 2020 Filing 5 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 Acknowledgement filed by Kenneth D Copeland. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MGB)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: on or before October 2, 2020, plaintiff shall either pay the required filing fee or file a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 9/2/2020. [Copy mailed to plaintiff] (LDR)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 10/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 9/2/2020. [Copy mailed to plaintiff] (LDR)
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Kenneth D Copeland (MGB)
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against F.C.I. Yazoo City (Medium) Food Service Department, F.C.I. Yazoo City (Medium) Health Service Department, filed by Kenneth D Copeland. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Copy of Tort Claim, #2 Attachment Medical Documents #3 Envelope #4 Notice of Assignment (MGB). (NEF and Notice of Assignment mailed to Plaintiff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Copeland v. F.C.I. Yazoo City (Medium) Health Service Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.C.I. Yazoo City (Medium) Food Service Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.C.I. Yazoo City (Medium) Health Service Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth D Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?