AMMP v. Pierce et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Pierce, Shamia L. Smith and AMMP
Defendant: Jackson-Hinds Comprehensive Health Center, Robert W. Naef, III, Central Mississippi Civic Improvement Association, Inc. d/b/a Jackson-Hinds Comprehensive Health Center, Nobel Attipoe, Paul Rice, Mississippi Maternal-Fetal Medicine, P.A. and Samuel Brown
Case Number: 3:2020cv00612
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by AMMP, Anthony Pierce, Shamia L. Smith (Kitchens, John)
October 2, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Nobel Attipoe, Samuel Brown, Central Mississippi Civic Improvement Association, Inc., Jackson-Hinds Comprehensive Health Center, Paul Rice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2017 CMCIA Deeming Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2018 CMCIA Deeming Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Meredith Torres)(Paige-Federal Gov, Mitzi)
October 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Nobel Attipoe, Samuel Brown, Central Mississippi Civic Improvement Association, Inc., Jackson-Hinds Comprehensive Health Center, Paul Rice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Meredith Torres)(Paige-Federal Gov, Mitzi)
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Mississippi Maternal-Fetal Medicine, P.A., Robert W. Naef, III.(Morris, Mildred)
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/28/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah)
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Substitution by Nobel Attipoe, Samuel Brown, Central Mississippi Civic Improvement Association, Inc., Jackson-Hinds Comprehensive Health Center, Paul Rice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of U.S. Attorney)(Paige-Federal Gov, Mitzi)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 State Court Record by Defendants Nobel Attipoe, Samuel Brown, Central Mississippi Civic Improvement Association, Inc., Jackson-Hinds Comprehensive Health Center, Paul Rice Volumes 1 (Paige-Federal Gov, Mitzi)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nobel Attipoe, Samuel Brown, Central Mississippi Civic Improvement Association, Inc., Jackson-Hinds Comprehensive Health Center and Paul Rice from Circuit Court of Hinds County, MS, case number 25CI1:20-cv-133-WLK. If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lower Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMMP v. Pierce et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Pierce
Represented By: John Wimberly Kitchens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shamia L. Smith
Represented By: John Wimberly Kitchens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMMP
Represented By: John Wimberly Kitchens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson-Hinds Comprehensive Health Center
Represented By: Mitzi Dease Paige-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W. Naef, III
Represented By: Mildred M. Morris
Represented By: Timothy L. Sensing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Mississippi Civic Improvement Association, Inc. d/b/a Jackson-Hinds Comprehensive Health Center
Represented By: Mitzi Dease Paige-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nobel Attipoe
Represented By: Mitzi Dease Paige-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Rice
Represented By: Mitzi Dease Paige-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Maternal-Fetal Medicine, P.A.
Represented By: Mildred M. Morris
Represented By: Timothy L. Sensing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Brown
Represented By: Mitzi Dease Paige-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?