Hunter v. Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut
Plaintiff: Tracy A. Hunter
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut
Case Number: 3:2020cv00622
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut (Briggs, Robert)
November 18, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut (Briggs, Robert)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Disclosure due by 11/13/2020; Jury Trial set for 11/15/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (Jackson) Wingate before District Judge Henry T. Wingate ; Pretrial Conference set for 10/8/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (Jackson) Wingate before District Judge Henry T. Wingate ; Discovery due by 6/1/2021 ; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 12/14/2020 ; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 12/14/2020 ; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 3/2/2021; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 4/1/2021 ; Motions due by 6/15/2021 ; Settlement Conference set for 7/9/2021 09:00 AM in Chambers 6.150 (Jackson) Anderson before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson; ADR Report due by 10/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 11/13/20 (Lewis, Nijah)
November 13, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 11/13/2020. Participants: Paul Ott and Robert Briggs. The Court spoke with counsel. Order to be entered. (Lewis, Nijah)
October 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Service of Pre-Discovery Core Information Disclosure by Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut (Briggs, Robert)
October 28, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut identifying Corporate Parent The Phoenix Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent The Travelers Indemnity Company for Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut. (Briggs, Robert)
October 22, 2020 Filing 5 First NOTICE of Service of Disclosure by Tracy A. Hunter (Ott, Paul)
October 7, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Rule 16(a) Initial Telephonic Case Management Conference reset 11/13/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440 (PLEASE REFER TO DOCKET NO. 3 - RULE 16 ORDER) (Lewis, Nijah)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut.(Briggs, Robert)
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 11/9/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 State Court Record by Defendant Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut Volumes 1 (Briggs, Robert)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut from Circuit Court of Hinds County, MS, case number 25CI1:20-cv-531-WLK. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid; receipt number 0538-4380614) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy A. Hunter
Represented By: Paul V. Ott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut
Represented By: Robert E. Briggs, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?