Phillips v. Gajdarik et al
Plaintiff: Leroy Phillips, Jr.
Defendant: Robert Gaidarik, John and Jane Does 1-10, PAM Cartage Carriers, LLC and P.A.M. Transport, Inc. doing business as PAM Transport
Case Number: 3:2020cv00629
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Filing 22 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF Receipt as to Letter to Hon. Mike Butler, Circuit Clerk of Newton County, transmitting certified copies of Order of Remand and Docket Sheet. (VM)
November 3, 2020 Filing 21 Letter from Arthur Johnston, Clerk to Hon. Mike Butler, Circuit Clerk of Newton County, transmitting certified copies of Order of Remand and Docket Sheet. (KNS)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF REMAND. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 11/03/2020 (KNS)
November 2, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves: Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/2/2020. PARTICIPANTS: Mack Clayton; (Plaintiff's counsel) Thomas Cooley (Plaintiff's counsel in 3:20cv555); David Dunbar and Chris Dunnells (Defense counsel). A hearing was held to discuss the status of the case. The Court was advised that Ralo Johnson v. P.A.M. Transport, 3:20cv624 will be filing a motion to consolidate in this case. (TRS). Modified on 11/3/2020 (TRS). .
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AGREED ORDER granting #16 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Certain Claims. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiffs claims against Defendants are dismissed consistent herein. Plaintiffs remaining claim of negligence against Gaidarik contained in the Plaintiffs first cause of action and the claim against P.A.M. based on vicarious liability are unaffected, and those claims shall continue. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 10/28/20 (TRS)
October 28, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/2/2020 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves. Dial in number to follow by email. (AC)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER cancelling telephonic case management conference set for October 29, 2020. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 10/27/2020. (JEJ)
October 27, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Mack A. Reeves on behalf of Leroy Phillips, Jr (Reeves, Mack)
October 13, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support re #16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Certain Claims filed by Robert Gaidarik, PAM Cartage Carriers, LLC (Dunbar, David)
October 13, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Certain Claims by Robert Gaidarik, PAM Cartage Carriers, LLC (Dunbar, David)
October 13, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Service of Request for Admissions by PAM Cartage Carriers, LLC (Dunnells, Christopher)
October 13, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by PAM Cartage Carriers, LLC (Dunnells, Christopher)
October 13, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by PAM Cartage Carriers, LLC (Dunnells, Christopher)
October 8, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Robert Gaidarik, PAM Cartage Carriers, LLC (Dunbar, David)
October 8, 2020 Filing 11 State Court Record by Defendants Robert Gaidarik, PAM Cartage Carriers, LLC (Dunbar, David)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AGREED ORDER to dismiss PAM Transport without prejudice from this matter. P.A.M. Transport, Inc. terminated. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 10/8/20 (TRS)
October 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Robert Gaidarik, PAM Cartage Carriers, LLC (Dunbar, David)
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2020 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ)
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PAM Cartage Carriers, LLC (Dunbar, David)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by P.A.M. Transport, Inc. (Dunbar, David)
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by P.A.M. Transport, Inc..(Dunbar, David)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by PAM Cartage Carriers, LLC.(Dunbar, David)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Robert Gaidarik.(Dunbar, David)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher G. Dunnells on behalf of Robert Gaidarik, P.A.M. Transport, Inc., PAM Cartage Carriers, LLC (Dunnells, Christopher)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Robert Gaidarik, P.A.M. Transport, Inc., PAM Cartage Carriers, LLC from Circuit Court of Newton County, Mississippi, case number 20-cv-152. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-4383433) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Gajdarik et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Gaidarik
Represented By: David C. Dunbar
Represented By: Christopher G. Dunnells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAM Cartage Carriers, LLC
Represented By: David C. Dunbar
Represented By: Christopher G. Dunnells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.A.M. Transport, Inc. doing business as PAM Transport
Represented By: David C. Dunbar
Represented By: Christopher G. Dunnells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Saltaformaggio
Represented By: Mack A. Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?