School and Scrubs Uniform Shop, Inc. v. Progressive Advantage Business Program et al
Plaintiff: School and Scrubs Uniform Shop, Inc.
Defendant: Midvale Indemnity Company, John Does Entities 1-5, Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc., John Doe Persons 1-5 and Progressive Advantage Business Program
Case Number: 3:2020cv00686
Filed: October 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Disclosure due by 12/31/2020; Jury Trial set for a two-week term of court commencing 3/1/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5A (Jackson) Jordan before Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III; Pretrial Conference set for 2/11/2022, time to be determined, in Chambers 5.750 (Jackson) Jordan before Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III; Discovery due by 9/17/2021; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 1/19/2021; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 1/19/2021; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 6/18/2021; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 7/19/2021; Motions due by 10/1/2021; Settlement Conference set for 12/1/2021 09:00 AM in Chambers 5.150 (Jackson) Ball before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. ADR Report due by 2/4/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 12/18/2020. (JEJ)
December 17, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 12/17/2020 in Jackson, MS. Appearing: Alton Peterson, Maison Heidelberg and Tim Crawley. (JEJ)
November 20, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Midvale Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent American Family Insurance Mutual Holding Company for Midvale Indemnity Company. (Crawley, Timothy)
November 20, 2020 Filing 8 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ)
November 6, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc..(Crawley, Timothy)
November 6, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Midvale Indemnity Company.(Crawley, Timothy)
November 6, 2020 Filing 5 Joinder in Document by Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc., Midvale Indemnity Company to #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Progressive Advantage Business Program (Crawley, Timothy)
November 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Bethany Brantley Johnson on behalf of Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc., Midvale Indemnity Company (Johnson, Bethany)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy D. Crawley on behalf of Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc., Midvale Indemnity Company (Crawley, Timothy)
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Progressive Advantage Business Program (Heidelberg, Cecil)
October 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Progressive Advantage Business Program from Circuit Court of Hinds County, Mississippi, case number 25CI1:20-CV-574-EFP. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid; receipt number 0538-4402951) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: School and Scrubs Uniform Shop, Inc. v. Progressive Advantage Business Program et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: School and Scrubs Uniform Shop, Inc.
Represented By: Alton E. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midvale Indemnity Company
Represented By: Bethany Brantley Johnson
Represented By: Timothy D. Crawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does Entities 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc.
Represented By: Bethany Brantley Johnson
Represented By: Timothy D. Crawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Persons 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Advantage Business Program
Represented By: Cecil Maison Heidelberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?