Mitchell v. Franchise Services of North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David M. Mitchell
Defendant: U-Save Holdings, Inc., Franchise Services of North America, Inc., Thomas P. McDonnell, III and Trace Residential Properties, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00687
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Kristi H Johnson
2 Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 2/3/2021 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson (Lewis, Nijah)
December 16, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Case Management Conference reset for 2/5/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440 (Lewis, Nijah)
December 15, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/30/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. (resetting before Magistrate Judge.) (Lewis, Nijah)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Kristi H. Johnson for all further proceedings. District Judge Carlton W. Reeves no longer assigned to case Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 12/14/20 (MGB)
December 14, 2020 Attorneys are advised to include the case number and the new judge assignment of 3:20cv687KHJ-LRA on future filed pleadings. (MGB)
December 1, 2020 Filing 17 AMENDED Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 2/3/2021 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney William F. Ray terminated Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 11/30/2020 (Lewis, Nijah)
November 30, 2020 Filing 15 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/30/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah)
November 30, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by David M. Mitchell (Ray, William)
November 30, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #10 : Incorrect event chosen. This document should have been docketed as Notice of Appearance. Attorney should refile selecting the correct event. (KNS)
November 30, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #11 and #12 : Incorrect party selected. Clerks office will edit this docket entry to include all appropriate filing parties. Attorney is directed to select correct parties in future filings. (KNS)
November 27, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Franchise Services of North America, Inc..(Gillis, John)
November 27, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by U-Save Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Final Order authorizing Post Petition Financing)(Liston, William) Modified on 11/30/2020 (KNS).
November 27, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by William Liston, III on behalf of U-Save Holdings, Inc. (Liston, William) Modified on 11/30/2020 (KNS).
November 25, 2020 Filing 10 ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY*** MOTION for Leave to Appear Entry of Appearance by David M. Mitchell (Ray, William) Modified on 11/30/2020 (KNS).
November 25, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Extend Time for Filing of Responsive Pleadings Deadline filed by Thomas P. McDonnell, III, Trace Residential Properties, LLC (Taggart, R.)
November 25, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Extend Time for Filing of Responsive Pleadings Deadline by Thomas P. McDonnell, III, Trace Residential Properties, LLC (Taggart, R.)
November 25, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Andrew Taggart, Jr on behalf of Thomas P. McDonnell, III, Trace Residential Properties, LLC (Taggart, R.)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion to Extend Deadline. The new deadline to answer or otherwise respond is January 4, 2021. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 11/25/20. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE ON THIS MOTION. (AC)
November 17, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David M. Mitchell. Franchise Services of North America, Inc. served on 11/6/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Montagnet, O.)
November 17, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David M. Mitchell. U-Save Holdings, Inc. served on 11/6/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Montagnet, O.)
November 17, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David M. Mitchell. Trace Residential Properties, LLC served on 11/6/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Montagnet, O.)
November 17, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David M. Mitchell. Thomas P. McDonnell, III served on 11/6/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Montagnet, O.)
November 5, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Franchise Services of North America, Inc., Thomas P. McDonnell, III, Trace Residential Properties, LLC and U-Save Holdings, Inc.. (ND)
October 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Franchise Services of North America, Inc., Thomas P. McDonnell, III, Trace Residential Properties, LLC, U-Save Holdings, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4404102), filed by David M. Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Franchise Services of North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U-Save Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: William Liston, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franchise Services of North America, Inc.
Represented By: John B. Gillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas P. McDonnell, III
Represented By: R. Andrew Taggart, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trace Residential Properties, LLC
Represented By: R. Andrew Taggart, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David M. Mitchell
Represented By: O. Stephen Montagnet, III
Represented By: William F. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?