Accident Insurance Company, Inc. v. BBH Construction Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Accident Insurance Company, Inc.
Defendant: Does 1-10, Providence Plantation II, L. P., BBH Construction Inc. and Jack Haynes
Case Number: 3:2020cv00700
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by G. Todd Burwell on behalf of Providence Plantation II, L. P. (Burwell, G.)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Accident Insurance Company, Inc.. Providence Plantation II, L. P. waiver sent on 11/18/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. (Brady, John)
November 10, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First Amended Complaint) against BBH Construction Inc., Jack Haynes, Providence Plantation II, L. P., filed by Accident Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Providence's Third Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - AIC Insurance Policy)(Brady, John)
November 9, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #2 : Attorney advises that there is an error in this entry, and it should be disregarded. It will be correctly refiled. (LAT)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY.***AMENDED COMPLAINT (First Amended Complaint) against BBH Construction Inc., Jack Haynes, Providence Plantation II, L. P., filed by Accident Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Amended Complaint)(Brady, John) Modified on 11/9/2020 (LAT).
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BBH Construction Inc., Does 1-10, Jack Haynes, Providence Plantation II, L. P. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643061288), filed by Accident Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- the Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Policy of Insurance, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Accident Insurance Company, Inc. v. BBH Construction Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Plantation II, L. P.
Represented By: G. Todd Burwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBH Construction Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Accident Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: John D. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?