Thomas v. Walmart Stores East, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Ellen Thomas
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-5, Jonathan "Luke&quot Carroll and Walmart Stores East, L.P.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00715
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by Ellen Thomas (Bogard, Jasmine)
December 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Service of Response to Interrogatories by Ellen Thomas (Bogard, Jasmine)
December 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jasmine T. Bogard on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bogard, Jasmine)
November 20, 2020 Filing 5 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/15/2021 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ)
November 11, 2020 Filing 4 State Court Record by Defendant Walmart Stores East, L.P. (Smith, Dorissa)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Louis on behalf of Jonathan "Luke" Carroll, Walmart Stores East, L.P. (Louis, Thomas)
November 5, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart Stores East, L.P. (Smith, Dorissa)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Stores East, L.P. from First Judicial District of Hinds County, MS, case number 25CO1:20-cv-2991-LCS. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4410845) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - PL's Responses to RFA, #3 Exhibit C - NOS - PL's Responses to RFA, #4 Exhibit D - Process pleadings, etc. served on Walmart, #5 Exhibit E - Affidavit of Luke Carroll, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Walmart Stores East, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan "Luke&quot Carroll
Represented By: Thomas M. Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores East, L.P.
Represented By: Dorissa S. Smith
Represented By: Thomas M. Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Thomas
Represented By: Carlos E. Moore
Represented By: Jasmine T. Bogard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?