Miller v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Plaintiff: Peggy Miller
Defendant: John Does 1-10, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP and Walmart Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00726
Filed: November 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Rajita Iyer Moss on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart Inc. (Moss, Rajita)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File State Court File. The filing on 12/4/2020 of the state court file from Leake County Circuit Court is hereby deemed timely. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 12/18/2020. (dcw)
December 4, 2020 Filing 7 State Court Record by Defendants Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart Inc. (Smith, Dorissa)
December 3, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File State Court File from Circuit Court of Leake County by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter to Clerk)(Smith, Dorissa)
November 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Service of Pre-Discovery Disclosure by Peggy Miller (McCumber, Harry)
November 20, 2020 Filing 4 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/15/2021 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ)
November 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Louis on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart Inc. (Louis, Thomas)
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart Inc. (Smith, Dorissa)
November 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart Inc. from Circuit Court of Leake County, Mississippi, case number 20-CV-191-VE-MO. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 05384414235) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Copy of Plaintiff's Response to Request for Admissions, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Service, #4 Exhibit D - Copy of Process, Pleadings and Orders Served on Walmart, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(PKM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Dorissa S. Smith
Represented By: Rajita Iyer Moss
Represented By: Thomas M. Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Dorissa S. Smith
Represented By: Rajita Iyer Moss
Represented By: Thomas M. Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Miller
Represented By: Harry Merritt McCumber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?