Sullivan v. Morgan et al
Plaintiff: John Magruder Sullivan
Defendant: Anthony Morgan and Western Express, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00740
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: LaKeysha Greer Isaac
2 Judge: Kristi H Johnson
3 Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2021 Parties should include the case number new Judge assignment of 3:20cv740KHJ-LGI on future filings. (MGB)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson no longer assigned to case Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 1/5/21 (MGB)
December 14, 2020 Attorneys are advised to include the case number and the new judge assignment of 3:20cv740KHJ-LRA on future filed pleadings. (MGB)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Kristi H. Johnson for all further proceedings. District Judge Carlton W. Reeves no longer assigned to case Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 12/14/20 (MGB)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting unopposed #7 Motion to Stay Proceedings pending mediation. Case is stayed until 2/1/2021; if case is not resolved, parties shall contact office of the Magistrate Judge before 2/1/2021 and reschedule CMC. CMC now scheduled 12/29/2020 is cancelled. Granting #8 unopposed Motion to Withdraw Discovery. No discovery to be propounded until CMC conducted. NO WRITTEN ORDER TO FOLLOW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 12/3/2020.(ACF)
December 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth C. Miller on behalf of John Magruder Sullivan (Miller, Kenneth)
November 30, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw and Withhold Serving Discovery Requests by Western Express, Inc. (Moore, James)
November 30, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Mediation by Western Express, Inc. (Moore, James)
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 State Court Record by Defendant Western Express, Inc. Volumes 1 (Ketchings, Kyle)
November 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian Medina on behalf of John Magruder Sullivan (Medina, Christian)
November 18, 2020 Filing 4 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/29/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah)
November 18, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Western Express, Inc. (Moore, James)
November 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle R. Ketchings on behalf of Western Express, Inc. (Ketchings, Kyle)
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Western Express, Inc. from Simpson County Circuit Court, MS, case number 64CI1:20-cv-78-EB. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4418531) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Combined State Court Filings, #2 Exhibit B- Plaintiff's Response to Requests for Admission, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. Morgan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Express, Inc.
Represented By: James R. Moore, Jr.
Represented By: Kyle R. Ketchings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Magruder Sullivan
Represented By: Michael Verdier Cory, Jr.
Represented By: Christian Medina
Represented By: Kenneth C. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?