Sanders et al v. Keyes et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Smith and Carlton Sanders
Defendant: Joseph D. Bergin, Robert Todd Williams and Ronnie Joe Keyes
Case Number: 3:2020cv00787
Filed: December 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2021 TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #16 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #10 MOTION to Remand . Plaintiffs' reply shall be filed on or before February 11, 2021. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on February 4, 2021. (DI)
February 3, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #16 : Incorrect event chosen. This document should have been docketed as a motion. Court staff has revised docket entry to reflect correct event. (KNS)
February 3, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand filed by Carlton Sanders, Stephen Smith (Citrin, Elizabeth) Modified to Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply 2/3/2021 (KNS).
February 1, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #15 : Proposed orders are not to be electronically filed as a separate pleading or as an attachment to a pleading, but instead are to be provided to chambers by e-mail (Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec.5.B.). (KNS)
January 29, 2021 TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #5 MOTION to Dismiss . Plaintiffs' response shall be filed on or before February 16, 2021. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on January 29, 2021. (DI)
January 29, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss by Carlton Sanders, Stephen Smith (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Citrin, Elizabeth)
January 28, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand filed by Joseph D. Bergin, Ronnie Joe Keyes, Robert Todd Williams (Pedigo, Scott)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER cancelling the telephonic case management conference set for February 18, 2021. This conference was set in error. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 1/21/2021. (JEJ)
January 20, 2021 Filing 13 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 2/18/2021 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460.(JEJ)
January 20, 2021 TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #10 MOTION to Remand. Defendants' response shall be filed on or before January 28, 2021. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on January 20, 2021. (DI)
January 19, 2021 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Remand by Joseph D. Bergin, Ronnie Joe Keyes, Robert Todd Williams (Champagne, Amy)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY except for remand-related discovery pending a ruling by the district judge on the Motion to Remand, at docket no. #10 . No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 1/19/2021.(JEJ)
January 15, 2021 TEXT-ONLY ORDER terminating #3 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Pursuant to Local Rule 42, a motion to consolidate should be filed only in the action bearing the lowest docket number. The motion to consolidate will be considered and ruled on in that case, No. 3:19-CV-721, in which it was also filed. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on January 15, 2021. (DI)
January 7, 2021 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Remand filed by Carlton Sanders, Stephen Smith (Citrin, Elizabeth)
January 7, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand by Carlton Sanders, Stephen Smith (Citrin, Elizabeth)
January 7, 2021 TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #5 MOTION to Dismiss . Plaintiffs' response shall be filed on or before February 1, 2021. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on January 7, 2021. (DI)
January 6, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss by Carlton Sanders, Stephen Smith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Citrin, Elizabeth)
December 28, 2020 TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline. Plaintiff's response to the motion to dismiss shall be filed on or before January 7, 2021. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on December 28, 2020. (DI)
December 28, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Extend Response to Motion to Dismiss Deadline Unopposed Motion by Carlton Sanders, Stephen Smith (Citrin, Elizabeth)
December 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Lewis Champagne on behalf of Joseph D. Bergin, Ronnie Joe Keyes, Robert Todd Williams (Champagne, Amy)
December 15, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Joseph D. Bergin, Ronnie Joe Keyes, Robert Todd Williams (Pedigo, Scott)
December 15, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Joseph D. Bergin, Ronnie Joe Keyes, Robert Todd Williams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, Civil Action No. 3:19-CV-721-DPJ-FKB, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Complaint, Civil Action No. 3:19-CV-721-DPJ-FKB, #3 Exhibit C -Koch Defendants Memorandum of Authorities in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss, Civil Action No. 3:19-CV-721-DPJ-FKB, #4 Exhibit D - July 2, 2020 Order, Civil Action No. 3:19-CV-721-DPJ-FKB, #5 Exhibit E - Complaint, Civil Action No. 3:20-cv-787-DPJ-FKB, #6 Exhibit F - February 2, 2015 letter from Ronnie Keyes to Contract Producers)(Pedigo, Scott)
December 15, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Joseph D. Bergin, Ronnie Joe Keyes, Robert Todd Williams (Pedigo, Scott)
December 15, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Joseph D. Bergin, Ronnie Joe Keyes, Robert Todd Williams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, Civil Action No. 3:19-CV-721-DPJ-FKB, #2 Exhibit B - July 2, 2020 Order, Civil Action No. 3:19-CV-721-DPJ-FKB, #3 Exhibit C - Complaint, Civil Action No. 3:20-cv-787-DPJ-FKB)(Pedigo, Scott)
December 10, 2020 Filing 2 State Court Record by Defendants Joseph D. Bergin, Ronnie Joe Keyes, Robert Todd Williams (Pedigo, Scott)
December 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Joseph D. Bergin, Ronnie Joe Keyes, Robert Todd Williams from Circuit Court of Scott County, Mississippi, case number 20-231. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0538-4432885) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders et al v. Keyes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Smith
Represented By: George Adam Sanford
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Citrin
Represented By: Terris C. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlton Sanders
Represented By: George Adam Sanford
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Citrin
Represented By: Terris C. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph D. Bergin
Represented By: Scott W. Pedigo
Represented By: Amy Lewis Champagne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Todd Williams
Represented By: Scott W. Pedigo
Represented By: Amy Lewis Champagne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Joe Keyes
Represented By: Scott W. Pedigo
Represented By: Amy Lewis Champagne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?