Pollard et al v. Smith-Rayford et al
Plaintiff: Brittany Pollard and Samuel Pollard, Jr.
Defendant: Jackson HMA, LLC also known as Merit Health Central doing business as Central Mississippi Medical Center, Merit Health Central, Samuel Brown, John Does 1-10, Edith Smith-Rayford and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv00791
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY pursuant to L.U.Civ.R. 16(b)(3)(B) pending a decision on the Motion to Dismiss at docket no. #7 . The telephonic case management conference set for February 18, 2021, is cancelled. No further written order shall issue from the Court. (A copy has been mailed to Pro Se Plaintiffs at 322 North Prentiss St., Jackson, MS 39209.) Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 1/29/2021. (JEJ)
January 25, 2021 Filing 11 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 2/18/2021 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for DEFENDANTS Edith Smith-Rayford M.D., et al. shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (A copy has been mailed to Pro Se Plaintiffs at 322 North Prentiss St., Jackson, MS 39209. Also, sent letter to Pro Se Plaintiffs requesting their telephone number for the docket.)(JEJ)
January 8, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jackson HMA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Barry Moss)(Boykin, Thurman)
January 8, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jackson HMA, LLC (Boykin, Thurman)
December 16, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Samuel Brown, Edith Smith-Rayford, United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Meredith Torres)(Norwood-Federal Gov, Andrew)
December 16, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Samuel Brown, Edith Smith-Rayford, United States of America (Norwood-Federal Gov, Andrew)
December 14, 2020 Filing 6 State Court Record by Defendants Samuel Brown, Edith Smith-Rayford, United States of America Volumes 1 (Norwood-Federal Gov, Andrew)
December 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen P. Kruger on behalf of Jackson HMA, LLC (Kruger, Stephen)
December 11, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Thurman L. Boykin, III on behalf of Jackson HMA, LLC (Boykin, Thurman)
December 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Substutition by Samuel Brown, Edith Smith-Rayford (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of U.S. Attorney)(Norwood-Federal Gov, Andrew)
December 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Mitzi Dease Paige-Federal Gov on behalf of Samuel Brown, Edith Smith-Rayford (Paige-Federal Gov, Mitzi)
December 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Samuel Brown, Jackson HMA, LLC, Edith Smith-Rayford from Hinds County Circuit Court, MS, case number 25CI1:20-cv-351-AHW. If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pollard et al v. Smith-Rayford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson HMA, LLC also known as Merit Health Central doing business as Central Mississippi Medical Center
Represented By: Andrew R. Norwood-Federal Gov
Represented By: Stephen P. Kruger
Represented By: Thurman L. Boykin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merit Health Central
Represented By: Andrew R. Norwood-Federal Gov
Represented By: Stephen P. Kruger
Represented By: Thurman L. Boykin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Brown
Represented By: Andrew R. Norwood-Federal Gov
Represented By: Mitzi Dease Paige-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edith Smith-Rayford
Represented By: Andrew R. Norwood-Federal Gov
Represented By: Mitzi Dease Paige-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Andrew R. Norwood-Federal Gov
Represented By: Mitzi Dease Paige-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Pollard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?