Meetze v. CMCF Medical Dept. et al
Plaintiff: Randy Wilmoth Meetze
Defendant: J. Farmer, Miller, Ron King, CMCF Medical Dept. and Doctor L. Sutton
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2021cv00021
Filed: January 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Northern (Jackson) Office
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (Copy mailed to Plaintiff.)(LAT)
January 12, 2021 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Mississippi Northern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00181. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 12, 2021 Case Transferred to District of Southern Mississippi. File transferred via ECF. CASE CLOSED. (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 1/12/2021.]
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER transferring case to US District Court, Southern District of Mississippi. CASE CLOSED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 1/12/21. (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 1/12/2021.]
December 29, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Pro Se Address by Randy Wilmoth Meetze (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 1/12/2021.]
November 5, 2020 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #6 Order Setting Spears Hearing. (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 1/12/2021.]
November 5, 2020 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #5 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 1/12/2021.]
November 5, 2020 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #4 Order Setting PSP Deadline and NOTICE OF INTENT to Continue Lawsuit. (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 1/12/2021.]
November 5, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 1/12/2021.]
November 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Pro Se Address by Randy Wilmoth Meetze (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 1/12/2021.]
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Spears Hearing set for 1/26/2021 10:00 AM in Oxford Courtroom 2 Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/20/2020. (cb) (Main Document 6 replaced on 10/20/2020) (cb). [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 1/12/2021.]
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Without Assessing Payment of Initial Filing Fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/20/2020. (cb) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 1/12/2021.]
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting PSP Deadline: PSP Forms due by 11/19/2020.. Signed by Clerk on 10/20/2020. (cb) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 1/12/2021.]
October 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Percy. (cb) (cb). [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 1/12/2021.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Randy Wilmoth Meetze. (cb) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 1/12/2021.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT challenging conditions of confinement, Jury Demand, filed by Randy Wilmoth Meetze. (cb) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 1/12/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meetze v. CMCF Medical Dept. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMCF Medical Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor L. Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Wilmoth Meetze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?