Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated v. Particle Media, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated
Defendant: John Does 1 - 10 and Particle Media, Inc. d/b/a News Break
Case Number: 3:2021cv00032
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Kristi H Johnson
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 NOTICE OF MAILING of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright in re #91 Order Dismissing Case. (ND)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - The parties have announced to the Court a settlement of this case. IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice as to all parties. Signed by District Judge Kristi H. Johnson on 10/19/2022 (ND)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by District Judge Kristi H. Johnson on 10/17/22. (KJ)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting #59 Motion to Exclude and denying #61 Motion to Exclude. Signed by District Judge Kristi H. Johnson on 9/20/2022. (CWB)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial set for 10/24/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B (Jackson) Johnson before District Judge Kristi H. Johnson. (KJ)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Amended ORDER granting #85 MOTION in Limine filed by Particle Media, Inc. Signed by District Judge Kristi H. Johnson on 9/2/22. (KJ)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Kristi H. Johnson: Pretrial Conference held on 9/2/2022. Jury Trial set to begin 10/24/2022 at 9:00 AM. APPEARANCES: Wyatt Emmerich, Plaintiff and Wilson H. Carroll for Plaintiff; Stephen J. Carmody and Karen E. Howell for Defendant. (CWB)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLYORDER. Given trial is set for October 24, 2022, the Final Pretrial Order is due by October 12. Jury Instructions, Witness Lists, and Exhibit Lists are due by October 17. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by District Judge Kristi H. Johnson on 9/2/22. (CWB)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting unopposed #85 Motion in Limine. Signed by District Judge Kristi H. Johnson on 9/1/2022. (CWB)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MEMORANDUM in Support re #85 MOTION in Limine filed by Particle Media, Inc. (Carmody, Stephen)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MOTION in Limine by Particle Media, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's First Discovery Responses, #2 Exhibit 2 - Mazzola Declaration)(Carmody, Stephen)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #63 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying #65 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part #67 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Kristi H. Johnson on 8/9/2022. (JBK)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference is set for 9/2/2022, at 1:00 P.M. in Courtroom 4B (Jackson) Johnson before District Judge Kristi H. Johnson. NOTE: NO LATER THAN NOON the day before the pretrial conference, counsel for the parties are to email the proposed joint pretrial order to Chambers. Trial is currently set for two-week trial term beginning 10/17/2022. (RT)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 REPLY to Response to Motion re #65 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Fair Use filed by Particle Media, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts of Blake Sell Deposition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Mazzola Decl., #3 Exhibit 3 - Griffith Report, #4 Exhibit 4 - Excerpts of Particle Media 30(b)(6) (R.Z.), #5 Exhibit 5 - Excerpts of Emmerich 30(b)(6))(Carmody, Stephen)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 REPLY to Response to Motion re #63 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Request for Permanent Injunctive Relief filed by Particle Media, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Mazzola Declaration)(Carmody, Stephen)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 REPLY to Response to Motion re #61 MOTION to Exclude Gregory Griffith filed by Particle Media, Inc. (Carmody, Stephen)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 REPLY to Response to Motion re #59 MOTION to Exclude J. Wyatt Emmerich filed by Particle Media, Inc. (Carmody, Stephen)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #61 MOTION to Exclude Gregory Griffith filed by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 RESPONSE in Opposition re #61 MOTION to Exclude Gregory Griffith filed by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #65 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Fair Use filed by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 RESPONSE in Opposition re #65 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Fair Use filed by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #63 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Request for Permanent Injunctive Relief filed by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 RESPONSE in Opposition re #63 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Request for Permanent Injunctive Relief filed by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #59 MOTION to Exclude J. Wyatt Emmerich filed by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 RESPONSE in Opposition re #59 MOTION to Exclude J. Wyatt Emmerich filed by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #69 Response in Opposition to Motion, #67 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , filed by Particle Media, Inc. (Carmody, Stephen) Modified on 5/18/2022 (LAT).
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 RESPONSE in Opposition re #67 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Particle Media, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Mazzola Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpts of Emmerich 30(b)(6), #3 Exhibit 3 - Registration Certificates, #4 Exhibit 4 - CPD Certificate of Authenticity, #5 Exhibit 5 - Seed Photograph, #6 Exhibit 6 - Particle Media 30(b)(6) (R.Z.), #7 Exhibit 7 - Excerpts of Sell Deposition, #8 Exhibit 8 - Expert Report of Blake Sell, #9 Exhibit 9 - Griffith Report, #10 Exhibit 10 - Particle Media 30(b)(6) (R.M.), #11 Exhibit 11 - Excerpts of Griffith Deposition, #12 Exhibit 12 - Facebook Example, #13 Exhibit 13 - Referral Analytics)(Carmody, Stephen)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM in Support re #67 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mazzola Transcript, #2 Exhibit Sell Transcript, #3 Exhibit Zhong Transcript, #4 Exhibit Zoltowski Transcript, #5 Exhibit Emmerich 30(b)(6) Transcript)(Carroll, Wilson)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM in Support re #65 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Fair Use filed by Particle Media, Inc. (Carmody, Stephen)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Fair Use by Particle Media, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Mazzola Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpts of Emmerich 30(b)(6), #3 Exhibit 3 - Registration Certificates, #4 Exhibit 4 - CPD Certificate of Authenticity, #5 Exhibit 5 - Seed Photograph, #6 Exhibit 6 - Excerpts of Sell Deposition, #7 Exhibit 7 - Expert Report of Blake Sell, #8 Exhibit 8 - Facebook Example, #9 Exhibit 9 - Excerpts of Griffith Deposition, #10 Exhibit 10 - Referral Analytics)(Carmody, Stephen)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM in Support re #63 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Request for Permanent Injunctive Relief filed by Particle Media, Inc. (Carmody, Stephen)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Request for Permanent Injunctive Relief by Particle Media, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Mazzola Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpts of Emmerich 30(b)(6))(Carmody, Stephen)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM in Support re #61 MOTION to Exclude Gregory Griffith filed by Particle Media, Inc. (Carmody, Stephen)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION to Exclude Gregory Griffith by Particle Media, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Mazzola Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Griffith Report, #3 Exhibit 3 - Excerpts of Griffith Deposition)(Carmody, Stephen)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM in Support re #59 MOTION to Exclude J. Wyatt Emmerich filed by Particle Media, Inc. (Carmody, Stephen)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION to Exclude J. Wyatt Emmerich by Particle Media, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Mazzola Deposition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's First Discovery Responses, #4 Exhibit 4 - 10/22/21 Emails, #5 Exhibit 5 - 10/28/21 Emails, #6 Exhibit 6 - Excerpts of Emmerich 30(b)(6), #7 Exhibit 7 - Excerpts of Wyatt Emmerich Deposition, #8 Exhibit 8 - 1/11/22 Email, #9 Exhibit 9 - 2/7/22 Email, #10 Exhibit 10 - Plaintiff's Supplemental Discovery Responses)(Carmody, Stephen)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Jury Trial set for a two week term beginning 10/17/2022 before District Judge Kristi H. Johnson; Pretrial Conference set for 9/2/2022 before District Judge Kristi H. Johnson; Motions due by 5/3/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on April 5, 2022 (KPM)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER denying #53 MOTION to Strike as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on April 5, 2022 (KPM)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker: Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/4/2022 to reset case deadlines and to address the pending motion to strike. A separate order will be entered resetting the case deadlines and denying the motion to strike as moot. PARTICIPANTS: Wilson Carroll for plaintiff; Karen Howell for defendant. (KPM)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Hearings: Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/4/2022 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. (KPM)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 RESPONSE to Motion re #53 MOTION to Strike #52 Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories (Supplemental) filed by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Kristi H. Johnson on 3/21/2022. (JBK)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM in Support re #53 MOTION to Strike #52 Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories (Supplemental) filed by Particle Media, Inc. (Carmody, Stephen)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION to Strike #52 Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories (Supplemental) by Particle Media, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures, #2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's First Discovery Responses, #3 Exhibit 3 - 10/22/21 Emails, collectively, #4 Exhibit 4 - 10/28/21 Email, #5 Exhibit 5 - Excepts of 30(b)(6) Deposition of Plaintiff, #6 Exhibit 6 - Excerpts of Deposition of Wyatt Emmerich, #7 Exhibit 7 - 1/11/22 Email, #8 Exhibit 8 - 2/7/22 Email, #9 Exhibit 9 - Plaintiff's Supplemental Response to Interrogatories)(Carmody, Stephen)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting Defendant's Ore Tenus Motion to extend deadline to challenge Plaintiff's supplementation of interrogatory responses. Any challenge to the supplementation must be filed by March 10, 2022. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on February 24, 2022. (AS)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Defendant's ORE TENUS MOTION to extend deadline to challenge Plaintiff's supplementation of interrogatory responses. (AS)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker: Settlement Conference held on 2/23/2022. The parties did not reach a settlement. APPEARANCES: Wilson Carroll for plaintiff; Stephen Carmody and Karen Howell for defendant. (KPM)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Response to Interrogatories by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker: Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 2/11/2022 to discuss Defendant's concern about Plaintiff's late supplementation of damage calculations. No resolution was reached. Plaintiff intends to supplement its interrogatory responses on or before February 14, 2022. Any challenges to the supplementation must be filed by February 28, 2022. PARTICIPANTS: Wilson Carroll for Plaintiff; Steve Carmody and Karen Howell for Defendant. (AS)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 2/11/2022 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. (KPM)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE to Take Deposition of A Corporate Representative by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER. As the Plaintiff's Motion to Compel has already been denied, Particle Media, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, for Extension of the Discovery Deadline and for Sanctions #46 is hereby denied as moot. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on January 19, 2022. (AS)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order ORE TENUS MOTION to Suspend Motions Deadline by Particle Media, Inc. (AS)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting Defendant's Ore Tenus Motion to Suspend the Motions Deadline. The motions deadline is herby suspended pending resolution of the issue related to the deposition of the corporate designee. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on January 19, 2022. (AS)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker: Telephonic Discovery Conference held on January 19, 2022, to discuss issues surrounding the corporate deposition of the Defendant. The parties are directed to further confer, and absent agreement, may file or refile appropriate discovery motions beginning on January 21, 2022. PARTICIPANTS: Wilson Carroll for Plaintiff; Steve Carmody and Karen Howell for Defendant. (AS)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Regarding Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on January 18, 2022 (KPM)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 2/23/2022 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6C, 501 E. Court Street, Jackson, MS before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel, the parties, and representatives with full settlement authority must be present. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 2/17/22. (KPM)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Conference: Telephonic Discovery Conference set for 1/19/2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. (AS)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE of Service of Defendant's Second Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories Response to Interrogatories by Particle Media, Inc. (Howell, Karen)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying #45 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, for Extension of Discovery Deadline and for Sanctions #45 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on January 7, 2022. (AS)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF DEPOSITION re #40 Notice to Take Deposition by Particle Media, Inc. (Carmody, Stephen)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION to Strike #45 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery MOTION for Sanctions by Particle Media, Inc. (Carmody, Stephen)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #45 : This document requests several motion reliefs. Every motion relief should be selected from the list of motion titles or each relief docketed separately. The same PDF document may be used for all motion filing entries. It is not necessary to refile as court staff has made the necessary correction. Attorney is advised to follow this procedure in future filings. (LAT)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION to Compel by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mazzola Transcript (Rough))(Carroll, Wilson). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, MOTION for Sanctions on 1/7/2022 (LAT).
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Designation of Experts by Particle Media, Inc. (Howell, Karen)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Blake Sell by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Neil Zoltowski by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Gregory Griffith by Particle Media, Inc. (Howell, Karen)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE to Take Deposition of A Corporate Representative by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Wyatt Emmerich by Particle Media, Inc. (Carmody, Stephen)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated by Particle Media, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 30(b)(6) Deposition Topics)(Carmody, Stephen)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Service of Designation of Experts by Particle Media, Inc. (Howell, Karen)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 RESPONSE in Support re #29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint as to Plaintiff's Copyright Infringement Claims for Unregistered Works and Plaintiff's State Law Claims filed by Particle Media, Inc. (Carmody, Stephen)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re #29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint as to Plaintiff's Copyright Infringement Claims for Unregistered Works and Plaintiff's State Law Claims filed by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER re #29 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Particle Media, Inc. Plaintiff's response was due yesterday. Plaintiff must either respond or confess that the Court should grant Defendant's motion no later than Monday, November 1, 2021. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by District Judge Kristi H. Johnson on 10/27/2021. (ANT)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Designation of Experts by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Defendant's Expert Designation Deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on October 22, 2021. (AS)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Expert Disclosure by Particle Media, Inc. (Carmody, Stephen)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ANSWER to #23 Amended Complaint by Particle Media, Inc..(Carmody, Stephen)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Support re #29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint as to Plaintiff's Copyright Infringement Claims for Unregistered Works and Plaintiff's State Law Claims filed by Particle Media, Inc. (Carmody, Stephen)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint as to Plaintiff's Copyright Infringement Claims for Unregistered Works and Plaintiff's State Law Claims by Particle Media, Inc. (Carmody, Stephen)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE to Take Deposition of A Corporate Representative by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #21 Unopposed Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on September 30, 2021 (KPM)
September 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
September 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Service of Response to Interrogatories by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
September 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Service of Designation of Experts by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Designation of Experts)(Carroll, Wilson)
September 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Does 1 - 10, Particle Media, Inc., filed by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated.(Carroll, Wilson)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #15 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on September 22, 2021. (AS)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order (for Entry of Agreed Protective Order) by Particle Media, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Agreed Protective Order)(Carmody, Stephen)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #20 : Incorrect linkage made. #20 REPLY to Response to Motion should be linked to #15 First MOTION to Amend/Correct. All related filings to motions (using the "Responses and Replies" category, with the exception of "Response to Order") should be linked back to the original motion. Court staff has made the correction. (LAT)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 Response in Opposition to Motion for Leave to Amend, re #15 First MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson) Modified on 9/14/2021 (LAT).
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #15 First MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Particle Media, Inc. (Carmody, Stephen)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 First MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Particle Media, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Copyright Search Results)(Carmody, Stephen)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Particle Media, Inc. (Carmody, Stephen)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Particle Media, Inc. (Carmody, Stephen)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 First MOTION to Amend/Correct by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint)(Carroll, Wilson)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by Particle Media, Inc. (Howell, Karen)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Response to Interrogatories by Particle Media, Inc. (Howell, Karen)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: The parties do not consent;Plaintiff's Disclosures due by 6/4/2021; Jury Trial set for a two week term beginning 6/6/2022 before District Judge Kristi H. Johnson; ETT: 7-10 days; Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2022 before District Judge Kristi H. Johnson; Discovery due by 1/6/2022; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 7/2/2021; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 7/2/2021; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 9/27/2021; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 10/25/2021; Motions due by 1/20/2022; ADR Report due by 5/6/2022; ADR to be completed by discovery deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on June 3, 2021 (KPM)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 6/3/2021. A case management order will be entered. PARTICIPANTS: Wilson Carroll for plaintiff; Stephen Carmody and Karen Howell for defendant. (KPM)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Particle Media, Inc. (Carmody, Stephen)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 6/3/2021 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 5/28/21. (KPM)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Particle Media, Inc..(Carmody, Stephen)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #8 : Attorney is advised when filing a document with combined discovery, each part of discovery must be filed separately. The same PDF document may be used for each filing. (LAT)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Particle Media, Inc.. Particle Media, Inc. waiver sent on 3/2/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (Carmody, Stephen)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Elizabeth Howell on behalf of Particle Media, Inc. (Howell, Karen)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. Carmody on behalf of Particle Media, Inc. (Carmody, Stephen)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF MAILING of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright in re #1 Complaint. (ND)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Particle Media, Inc.. (ND)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Particle Media, Inc. and John Does 1 - 10 ( Filing fee $ 402 paid; receipt number 34643062105 ), filed by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Article 1 and Copyright Registration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated v. Particle Media, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 - 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Particle Media, Inc. d/b/a News Break
Represented By: Stephen J. Carmody
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated
Represented By: Wilson H. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?