Harper v. Board of Supervisors of Warren County, Mississippi et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth M. Harper
Defendant: Kelle Barfield, Shawn Jackson, Edward Herring, Board of Supervisors of Warren County, Mississippi, William H. Banks, Jr. and Jeffery P. Holland
Case Number: 3:2021cv00060
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by William H. Banks, Jr, Kelle Barfield, Board of Supervisors of Warren County, Mississippi, Edward Herring, Jeffery P. Holland, Shawn Jackson.(Allen, William)
February 19, 2021 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #4 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #12 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Kenneth M. Harper (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Plaintiff declaration)(Begley, Samuel)
February 16, 2021 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 Response in Opposition to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by William H. Banks, Jr, Kelle Barfield, Board of Supervisors of Warren County, Mississippi, Edward Herring, Jeffery P. Holland, Shawn Jackson (Malone, Jessica) Modified on 2/17/2021 to add link to motion (ND).
February 16, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by William H. Banks, Jr, Kelle Barfield, Board of Supervisors of Warren County, Mississippi, Edward Herring, Jeffery P. Holland, Shawn Jackson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Resignation, #2 Exhibit B. December Minutes, #3 Exhibit C. January Minutes, #4 Exhibit D. Teller Correspondence, #5 Exhibit E. Atty General's Opp.)(Malone, Jessica)
February 16, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica S. Malone on behalf of William H. Banks, Jr, Kelle Barfield, Board of Supervisors of Warren County, Mississippi, Edward Herring, Jeffery P. Holland, Shawn Jackson (Malone, Jessica)
February 16, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by William Robert Allen on behalf of William H. Banks, Jr, Kelle Barfield, Board of Supervisors of Warren County, Mississippi, Edward Herring, Jeffery P. Holland, Shawn Jackson (Allen, William)
February 10, 2021 TEXT-ONLY ORDER. By agreement of the parties, Defendants' brief in opposition to the motion for preliminary injunction is due Feb. 16, 2021. Plaintiff's rebuttal brief is due Feb. 19, 2021. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on February 10, 2021. No further written order will issue. (EHP)
February 10, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kenneth M. Harper. Jeffery P. Holland served on 2/8/2021, answer due 3/1/2021. (Begley, Samuel)
February 10, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kenneth M. Harper. Edward Herring served on 2/8/2021, answer due 3/1/2021. (Begley, Samuel)
February 10, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kenneth M. Harper. Kelle Barfield served on 2/8/2021, answer due 3/1/2021. (Begley, Samuel)
February 4, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kenneth M. Harper. William H. Banks, Jr served on 2/2/2021, answer due 2/23/2021. (Begley, Samuel)
February 4, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kenneth M. Harper. Board of Supervisors of Warren County, Mississippi served on 2/2/2021, answer due 2/23/2021. (Begley, Samuel)
January 29, 2021 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Kenneth M. Harper (Begley, Samuel)
January 29, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Kenneth M. Harper (Begley, Samuel)
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to William H. Banks, Jr, Kelle Barfield, Board of Supervisors of Warren County, Mississippi, Edward Herring, Jeffery P. Holland, Shawn Jackson. (LAT)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William H. Banks, Jr, Kelle Barfield, Board of Supervisors of Warren County, Mississippi, Edward Herring, Jeffery P. Holland, Shawn Jackson ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0538-4472990), filed by Kenneth M. Harper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-BUDGET LETTER, #2 Exhibit B- RESIGNATION, #3 Exhibit C- RESCIND RESIGNATION, #4 Exhibit D- OCT 20 MINUTES, #5 Exhibit E- DEC MINUTES, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harper v. Board of Supervisors of Warren County, Mississippi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelle Barfield
Represented By: Jessica S. Malone
Represented By: William Robert Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Jackson
Represented By: Jessica S. Malone
Represented By: William Robert Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Herring
Represented By: Jessica S. Malone
Represented By: William Robert Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Supervisors of Warren County, Mississippi
Represented By: Jessica S. Malone
Represented By: William Robert Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William H. Banks, Jr.
Represented By: Jessica S. Malone
Represented By: William Robert Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery P. Holland
Represented By: Jessica S. Malone
Represented By: William Robert Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth M. Harper
Represented By: Samuel L. Begley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?