Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society v. Mayo et al
Plaintiff: Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society
Defendant: Carrie Murphy, Terri Mayo, Grant Mayo and Melissa Hamrick
Case Number: 3:2021cv00322
Filed: May 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: LaKeysha Greer Isaac
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, by Melissa Hamrick, Carrie Murphy.(Settlemires, Steven)
June 10, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society. Melissa Hamrick as co-conservator and/or co-guardian for the person of Betty Mowdy, widow of Mowdy; served on 6/8/2021, answer due 6/29/2021. (McCraney, W.) Modified on 6/10/2021 to add correct answer deadline (ND).
June 10, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society. Carrie Murphy served on 6/8/2021, answer due 6/29/2021. (McCraney, W.) Modified on 6/10/2021 to correct answer deadline (ND).
June 10, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society. Melissa Hamrick served on 6/8/2021, answer due 6/29/2021. (McCraney, W.) Modified on 6/10/2021 to add correct answer date (ND).
June 10, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society. Carrie Murphy as co-conservator and/or co-guardian for the person of Betty Mowdy, widow of Mowdy; served on 6/8/2021, answer due 6/29/2021. (McCraney, W.) Modified on 6/10/2021 to add correct answer deadline (ND).
June 10, 2021 Filing 5 **ERROR - DISREGARD**SUMMONS Returned Executed by Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society. Carrie Murphy served on 6/7/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. (McCraney, W.) Modified on 6/10/2021 (ND).
June 10, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #5 . Attorney advises that there is an error in this entry, and it should be disregarded. It has been correctly refiled as Doc. #6 . (ND)
June 8, 2021 Filing 4 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 7/26/2021 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to isaac_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. The parties are instructed to use the following dial-in number for the conference call. Dial-in #:(888) 684-8852; Passcode: 3566012(Lewis, Nijah)
June 4, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Melissa Hamrick(as co-conservator and/or co-guardian for the person of Betty Mowdy, widow of Mowdy), Melissa Hamrick, Carrie Murphy(as co-conservator and/or co-guardian for the person of Betty Mowdy, widow of Mowdy), and Carrie Murphy. (ND)
May 25, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Grant Mayo, Terri Mayo.(Shanley, Dion)
May 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Melissa Hamrick (as co-conservator and/or co-guardian for the person of Betty Mowdy, widow of Mowdy), Melissa Hamrick, Grant Mayo, Terri Mayo, Carrie Murphy (as co-conservator and/or co-guardian for the person of Betty Mowdy, widow of Mowdy), and Carrie Murphy ( Filing fee $ 402 paid; receipt number 0538-4552042 ), filed by Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Exhibit B - July 14, 2014 Application, #3 Exhibit C - September 23, 2014 Application, #4 Exhibit D - Form 181, #5 Exhibit E - Constitution and Laws, #6 Exhibit F - November 19, 2020 Correspondence, #7 Exhibit G - December 22, 2020 Correspondence, #8 Exhibit H - January 19, 2021 Correspondence, #9 Exhibit I - January 19, 2021 Correspondence, #10 Exhibit J - January 26, 2021 Correspondence, #11 Exhibit K - Arbitration Complaint, #12 Exhibit L - Petition, #13 Exhibit M - Email Correspondence, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society v. Mayo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie Murphy
Represented By: Steven D. Settlemires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri Mayo
Represented By: Dion J. Shanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Mayo
Represented By: Dion J. Shanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Hamrick
Represented By: Steven D. Settlemires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society
Represented By: W. Thomas McCraney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?