Jackson v. Jackson HMA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Demmise Jackson
Defendant: John Does 1-5, Dana Malone, Jackson HMA, LLC doing business as Merit Health Central and Samuel Brown
Case Number: 3:2021cv00336
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2021 Filing 25 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF Receipt filed as to Hinds County Circuit Clerk Zack Wallace in receipt of transmitted certified copies of Order of remand and Docket Sheet. (CO)
June 15, 2021 Filing 24 Letter from Arthur Johnston, Clerk, transmitting certified copies of Order of remand and Docket Sheet and requesting acknowledgment on the copy provided along with a self-addressed, stamped envelope for return. (KNS) (Main Document 24 replaced on 7/6/2021) (KNS). Modified on 7/6/2021 to correct zip code (KNS).
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Remand; finding as moot #9 Motion to Strike. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 06/15/2021 (KNS)
June 12, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE to Take Deposition of 30(b)(6) of Jackson HMA, LLC d/b/a Merit Health Central for Remand Purposed Only by Demmise Jackson (Satcher, John)
June 12, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dana Malone by Demmise Jackson (Satcher, John)
June 12, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Service of Remand Related Discovery Request for Admissions by Demmise Jackson (Satcher, John)
June 12, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Service of Remand Related Discovery Request for Production by Demmise Jackson (Satcher, John)
June 12, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Service of Remand Related Discovery Interrogatories by Demmise Jackson (Satcher, John)
June 10, 2021 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re #9 MOTION to Strike #2 MOTION to Remand (Affidavit of Counsel [ECF 2-3]) filed by Demmise Jackson (Satcher, John)
June 10, 2021 Filing 16 Response in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Strike #2 MOTION to Remand (Affidavit of Counsel [ECF 2-3]) by Jackson HMA, LLC, Dana Malone (Boykin, Thurman) filed by Demmise Jackson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Johnny Newsome, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Eddie Seward)(Satcher, John)
June 10, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Dana Malone (Boykin, Thurman)
June 3, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Dana Malone filed by Demmise Jackson (Satcher, John)
June 3, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Dana Malone filed by Demmise Jackson (Satcher, John)
May 28, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #11 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Jackson HMA, LLC, Dana Malone (Boykin, Thurman)
May 28, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Remand filed by Jackson HMA, LLC, Dana Malone (Boykin, Thurman)
May 28, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Strike #2 MOTION to Remand (Affidavit of Counsel [ECF 2-3]) filed by Jackson HMA, LLC, Dana Malone (Boykin, Thurman)
May 28, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Strike #2 MOTION to Remand (Affidavit of Counsel [ECF 2-3]) by Jackson HMA, LLC, Dana Malone (Boykin, Thurman)
May 27, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of The United States Under 42 U.S.C. 233(l)(1) by Samuel Brown (Norwood-Federal Gov, Andrew)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY except for remand-related discovery pending a ruling by the district judge on the Motion to Remand, at docket no. #2 . No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 5/26/2021. (JEJ)
May 21, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jackson HMA, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mississippi HMA Holdings, II, LLC for Jackson HMA, LLC. (Boykin, Thurman)
May 21, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Jackson HMA, LLC.(Boykin, Thurman)
May 21, 2021 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Dana Malone (Boykin, Thurman)
May 21, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Dana Malone (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint Filed 2-21-20, #2 Exhibit Attorney's Voluntary Dismissal)(Boykin, Thurman)
May 19, 2021 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #2 MOTION to Remand filed by Demmise Jackson (Satcher, John)
May 19, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Remand by Demmise Jackson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Claim (June 13, 2019), #2 Exhibit Notice of Claim (April 24, 2020), #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Attorney)(Satcher, John)
May 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jackson HMA, LLC from Circuit Court of Hinds County, Mississippi, case number 21-125. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0538-4553934) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Copy of Complaint and Executed Summons, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Claim, #3 Exhibit 3 - State Court File, #4Civil Cover Sheet -)(PKM) Modified on 5/14/2021 (PKM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Jackson HMA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Malone
Represented By: Thurman L. Boykin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson HMA, LLC doing business as Merit Health Central
Represented By: Thurman L. Boykin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demmise Jackson
Represented By: John N Satcher, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?