McKinley v. Frazier et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Frank McKinley
Defendant: Dr. Unknown Frazier, Dr. Unknown Farmer, Unknown Sick Call Screener and Unknown Unknown
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2021cv00528
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Filing 15 AMENDED MOTION to Supplement Pleading re #12 MOTION to Amend/Supplement #1 Complaint, AMENDED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Relief re #6 MOTION (Request) for Preliminary Injunction Relief, by Anthony Frank McKinley. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(PG)
October 12, 2021 Filing 14 Letter from Anthony McKinley. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (PG)
October 4, 2021 Filing 13 Letter from Anthony McKinley. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (PG)
September 29, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION For Leave to Amend/Supplement #1 Complaint, by Anthony Frank McKinley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Supporting Documents, #2 Exhibit 2 - Supporting Documents, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope)(PG)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball, for all further proceedings provided for by 28 U.S.C. 636 and Rule 72 to include conducting hearings and submitting to the district judge assigned to this cause proposed findings of fact and recommendations for the disposition of this cause. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 9/29/2021 (PG)
September 28, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Dr. Frazier and Dr. Farmer on 9/28/2021. Waiver of Service due by 10/28/2021. (LDR)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, the Clerk of Court is directed to issue a Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons for Defendants Dr. Frazier and Dr. Farmer. Defendants are directed to file a signed Waiver form or a Response, within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 9/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of A Summons - Dr. Frazier and Dr. Farmer, #2 Waiver of Service of Summons Form)(LDR)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 9/27/2021. (LDR)
September 16, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Facts and Retaliation, by Anthony Frank McKinley. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PG)
September 16, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION (Request) for Preliminary Injunction Relief, by Anthony Frank McKinley. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PG)
September 16, 2021 Filing 5 AUTHORIZATION FOR RELEASE OF ACCOUNT INFORMATION AND CERTIFICATE re #4 Order, by Anthony Frank McKinley. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PG)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: on or before 9/20/2021, plaintiff shall either pay the required filing fee or file a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 8/19/2021. (LDR)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 9/20/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 8/19/2021. (LDR)
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Anthony Frank McKinley. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(PG)
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Unknown Farmer, Unknown Frazier, Unknown Unknown, filed by Anthony Frank McKinley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Administrative Remedy Program, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Notice of Assignment, #4 Envelope)(PG) Modified on 8/17/2021 (PG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKinley v. Frazier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Frank McKinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Unknown Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Unknown Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Sick Call Screener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?