Griffin v. Jackson
Plaintiff: Jewel Griffin
Defendant: Chris Jackson
Case Number: 3:2021cv00609
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Kristi H Johnson
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2021 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Jewel Griffin. Objections to R&R due by 11/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on November 16, 2021. (js)
November 15, 2021 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to #4 Order to Show Cause. Mail sent to Jewel Griffin. (VM)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 11/3/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on October 20, 2021. (js)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #1 Complaint and #2 IFP Application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on September 28, 2021. (js)
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jewel Griffin. (VM)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chris Jackson, filed by Jewel Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Assignment)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jewel Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?