Gray et al v. Mississppi Department of Rehabilitation Services
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn Gray and Clell O. McCurdy
Defendant: Mississppi Department of Rehabilitation Services
Case Number: 3:2021cv00710
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: LaKeysha Greer Isaac
Referring Judge: Kristi H Johnson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2021 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Discovery Deadline by Gwendolyn Gray, Clell O. McCurdy (Hearn, Philip)
December 22, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Receipt of Deposition of Clell O. McCurdy by Mississppi Department of Rehabilitation Services (Johnson-State Gov, Bethany)
December 15, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Clell O. McCurdy by Mississppi Department of Rehabilitation Services (Johnson-State Gov, Bethany)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER. Plaintiff is to provide availability for the deposition of Clell McCudry on or before Tuesday, December 7, 2021. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 12/1/2021 (NL)
November 19, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Receipt of Deposition of Gwendolyn Gray by Mississppi Department of Rehabilitation Services (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Original Stamped Coversheet)(Middleton, Morgan)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #13 Motion to Extend Deadlines. The Court shall extend the Discovery and Motion deadlines by sixty (60) days and reschedule the trial for the next term. Jury Trial set for two week term commencing on 6/6/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B (Jackson) before District Judge Kristi H. Johnson; Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2022 at 09:00 AM in Chambers 4.550 (Jackson) before District Judge Kristi H. Johnson; Discovery due by 1/3/2022; Motions due by 1/17/2022; ADR Report due by 5/6/2022. NO WRITTEN ORDER TO FOLLOW. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 11/9/2021 (BB)
November 5, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan A. Middleton on behalf of Mississppi Department of Rehabilitation Services (Middleton, Morgan)
November 4, 2021 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Extend Discovery and Motions Deadline by Mississppi Department of Rehabilitation Services (Johnson-State Gov, Bethany)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER AMENDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Jury Trial set for 4/18/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B (Jackson) Johnson before District Judge Kristi H. Johnson Pretrial Conference set for 3/4/2022 09:00 AM in Chambers 4.550 (Jackson) Johnson before District Judge Kristi H. Johnson Discovery due by 11/4/2021 Motions due by 11/18/2021 ADR Report due by 2/25/2022. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 11/4/21 (NL)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' pattern-and-practice claim under Title VII and any Title VII claim brought by Plaintiffs Kenisha Black and Sondra Gathings for actions unrelated to MDRS's promotion of Carol Elrod are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Kristi H. Johnson on 5/14/2021 (LAT)
November 3, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY to #9 Response in Opposition to #5 Motion to Dismiss in re #10 Memorandum in Support #9 Response in Opposition filed by Gwendolyn Gray, Clell O. McCurdy. (LAT)
November 3, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #9 Response in Opposition to #5 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Gwendolyn Gray, Clell O. McCurdy. (LAT)
November 3, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Gwendolyn Gray, Clell O. McCurdy. (LAT)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Disclosure due by 3/4/2021 Jury Trial set for 2/14/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B (Jackson) Johnson before District Judge Kristi H. Johnson Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B (Jackson) Johnson before District Judge Kristi H. Johnson Discovery due by 8/31/2021 Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 3/29/2021 Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 3/29/2021 Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 6/2/2021 Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 7/2/2021 Motions due by 9/14/2021 Settlement Conference set for 10/7/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6D (Jackson) Isaac before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac ADR Report due by 12/31/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 2/25/21 (LAT)
November 3, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint, by Mississppi Department of Rehabilitation Services.(LAT)
November 3, 2021 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mississppi Department of Rehabilitation Services. (LAT)
November 3, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Mississppi Department of Rehabilitation Services. (LAT)
November 3, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mississppi Department of Rehabilitation Services, filed by Gwendolyn Gray, Clell O. McCurdy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- cCarges of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B- Notices of Right to Sue, #3 Exhibit C- Hart Right to Sue, #4 Exhibit D- Exhibit Hart EEOC Charge, #5 Exhibit E- Hart Response to MDRS, #6 Exhibit F- Laury EEOC Charge, #7 Exhibit G- Laury Right to Sue)(LAT)
November 3, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mississppi Department of Rehabilitation Services, filed by Gwendolyn Gray, Clell O. McCurdy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Charges of discrimination, #2 Exhibit B- Notices of right to sue, #3 Exhibit C- Black charge of discrimination)(LAT)
November 3, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Mississppi Department of Rehabilitation Services, filed by Gwendolyn Gray, Clell O. McCurdy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Charges of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B - Notices of Right to Sue, #3 Exhibit C - Black Charge of Discrimination, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEVER THE CLAIMS OF SEVERAL PLAINTIFFS. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that each of the newly severed cases should be assigned to District Judge Kristi H. Johnson and the undersigned Magistrate Judge. The Clerk of Court is directed to file a copy of the Complaint 1 , Amended Complaint 2 , Amended Complaint 5 , Motion to Dismiss 7 , Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss 8 , Answer 9 , Case Management Order 13 , Response to Motion to Dismiss 17 , Memorandum in Support of Response to Motion to Dismiss 18 , Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss 19 , Order granting Motion to Dismiss 23 , as well as a copy of this Order in each of the newly severed cases. All pending deadlines shall apply in each of the newly severed cases, and the case management deadlines in 3:20-cv-643-KHJ-LGI shall be input in each of the newly severed cases. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, unless the Court subsequently orders otherwise, it will not be necessary for Plaintiffs to refile or re-serve the complaint. In subsequent filings, the caption of each newly severed case should include only the plaintiff in that particular case. Additionally, under the circumstances, the Court will waive the filing fee for each of the newly severed claims. Plaintiffs' counsel is advised that the Court is making this exception to the filing fee requirement for these cases only and may not do so in the future. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 11/3/2021 (LAT) Modified on 11/3/2021 to reflect document text (LAT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray et al v. Mississppi Department of Rehabilitation Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn Gray
Represented By: Philip C. Hearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clell O. McCurdy
Represented By: Philip C. Hearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississppi Department of Rehabilitation Services
Represented By: Bethany Brantley Johnson-State Gov
Represented By: Morgan A. Middleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?