Smith v. State of Mississippi et al
Plaintiff: Doran Maurice Smith
Defendant: State of Mississippi, Unknown Prosecutor, Sheriff Randall Tucker, Sheriff Department (Jail), Unknown Arresting Officers, Brad Mills, Randy Harris, Madison County, Mississippi, Officer Curtis Chism, Merit Health and Nurse Charlene Burt
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2022cv00409
Filed: July 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: LaKeysha Greer Isaac
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - ORDERED that Defendant Unknown Prosecutor is replaced with Randy Harris; Defendant Sheriff Department (Jail) is replaced with Madison County, Mississippi; and Defendant Unknown Arresting Officers is replaced with Officer Curtis Chism. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Merit Health and Nurse Charlene Burt are added as Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 9/2/2022 (VM)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #11 Motion for Hearing without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 8/26/2022 (VM)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 8/26/2022 (VM)
August 19, 2022 Filing 12 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #5 Order Opsp2, Acknowledgement filed by Doran Maurice Smith. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(VM)
August 17, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Hearing by Doran Maurice Smith. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(VM)
August 17, 2022 Filing 10 ATTACHMENT: CLARIFYING CLAIMS re #7 Amended Complaint by Doran Maurice Smith. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(VM)
August 12, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE by Doran Maurice Smith re #7 Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(VM)
August 11, 2022 Filing 8 Mail Returned as REFUSED as to #5 Order Opsp2. Mail sent to Doran Maurice Smith at Securus Digital Mail-Madison County, Post Box 1103, Lebanon, MO 65536. (CO)
August 3, 2022 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Brad Mills, Sheriff Department (Jail), State of Mississippi, Randall Tucker, Unknown Arresting Officers, Unknown Prosecutor, filed by Doran Maurice Smith. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(VM)
August 1, 2022 Filing 6 Mail sent to Plaintiff Returned as Undeliverable as to Staff Notes re NEF and Notice of Assignment. (VM)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 8/25/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 07/26/2022 (KNS)
July 25, 2022 Filing 4 Letter from Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Affidavit and Notice to Judge Brad Mills, #2 Envelope) (KNS)
July 18, 2022 Filing 3 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Doran Maurice Smith. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(VM)
July 18, 2022 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #1 Complaint filed by Doran Maurice Smith. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(VM)
July 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brad Mills, Sheriff Department (Jail), State of Mississippi, Randall Tucker, Unknown Arresting Officers, Unknown Prosecutor, filed by Doran Maurice Smith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Envelope, #3 Notice of Assignment)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. State of Mississippi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doran Maurice Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Prosecutor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Randall Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Department (Jail)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Arresting Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison County, Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Curtis Chism
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merit Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Charlene Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?