Stanford v. Brandon Nursing and Rehabilation Center, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mark Stanford
Defendant: Brandon Nursing and Rehabilation Center, LLC, Aurora Cares, LLC, DTD HC, LLC, D&N, LLC, Donald T. Denz, Norbert A. Bennett, Unidentified Entities 1-10, John Does 1-10 and Brandon Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00589
Filed: October 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: LaKeysha Greer Isaac
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2022 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Mark Stanford (Williams, Richard)
December 5, 2022 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Mark Stanford (Williams, Richard) Modified on 12/5/2022 (VM).
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY. The proceedings in this case are therefore stayed pursuant to the Local Rules including the Telephonic Case Management Conference. Counsel for the moving party shall promptly notify the Magistrate Judge of the entry of any order denying the motion. A telephonic case management conference shall be scheduled within sixty (60) days thereafter. If the parties have not received notice of a case management conference within thirty (30) days of the entry of the order denying the motion, counsel should bring this to the Court's attention via e-mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 11/28/22 (NL)
November 23, 2022 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aurora Cares, LLC, Brandon Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, D&N, LLC, DTD HC, LLC (Frye, William)
November 22, 2022 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Aurora Cares, LLC, Norbert A. Bennett, D&N, LLC, DTD HC, LLC, Donald T. Denz (Frye, William)
November 22, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Aurora Cares, LLC, Norbert A. Bennett, D&N, LLC, DTD HC, LLC, Donald T. Denz (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Ranessa Myles, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Tina Alexander, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Donald Denz, #5 Exhibit E - Declaration of Norbert Bennett, #6 Exhibit F - Young Complaint, #7 Exhibit G - Young Opinion and Order, #8 Exhibit H - Admission Agreement)(Frye, William)
November 22, 2022 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Brandon Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC (Frye, William)
November 22, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Brandon Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Arbitration Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Appointment of Surrogate)(Frye, William)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #12 . Defendants are granted up to and including November 22, 2022, to file response(s) to the Complaint. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 11/15/2022 (NL)
November 14, 2022 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Aurora Cares, LLC, Norbert A. Bennett, Brandon Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, D&N, LLC, DTD HC, LLC, Donald T. Denz (Gunn, George)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendants are granted up to and including November 15, 2022, to file response(s) to the Complaint. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 10/31/22 (NL)
October 28, 2022 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Aurora Cares, LLC, Norbert A. Bennett, Brandon Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, D&N, LLC, DTD HC, LLC, Donald T. Denz (Gunn, George)
October 18, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Stanford. Norbert A. Bennett served on 10/13/2022, answer due 11/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Process Server Proof of Service)(Williams, Richard)
October 18, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Stanford. Donald T. Denz served on 10/13/2022, answer due 11/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Process Server Proof of Service)(Williams, Richard)
October 18, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Stanford. DTD HC, LLC served on 10/13/2022, answer due 11/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Process Server Proof of Service)(Williams, Richard)
October 18, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Stanford. D&N, LLC served on 10/13/2022, answer due 11/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Process Server Proof of Service)(Williams, Richard)
October 13, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Stanford. Aurora Cares, LLC served on 10/11/2022, answer due 11/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Process Server Proof of Service)(Williams, Richard) Modified on 10/13/2022 (KNS).
October 13, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Stanford. Brandon Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC served on 10/11/2022, answer due 11/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Process Server Proof of Service)(Williams, Richard) Modified on 10/13/2022 (KNS).
October 13, 2022 Filing 4 ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Stanford. Aurora Cares, LLC served on 10/11/2022, answer due 11/1/2022. (Williams, Richard) Modified on 10/13/2022 (KNS).
October 13, 2022 Filing 3 ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Stanford. Brandon Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC served on 10/11/2022, answer due 11/1/2022. (Williams, Richard) Modified on 10/13/2022 (KNS).
October 13, 2022 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #s #3 and #4 : A return on summons should not be filed without the first page, as issued, preceding the return. Additionally, AO Form 440, Proof of Service should be filed. The Proof of Service by process server should be attached to AO Form 440 as an attachment. Attorney is directed to refile. (KNS)
October 7, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Aurora Cares, LLC, Norbert A. Bennett, Brandon Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, D&N, LLC, DTD HC, LLC, Donald T. Denz. (KNS)
October 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aurora Cares, LLC, Norbert A. Bennett, Brandon Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, D&N, LLC, DTD HC, LLC, Donald T. Denz, John Does 1-10, Unidentified Entities 1-10 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 2089), filed by Mark Stanford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Expert Consultation, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanford v. Brandon Nursing and Rehabilation Center, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Stanford
Represented By: Richard Paul Williams, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Nursing and Rehabilation Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Cares, LLC
Represented By: George Clanton Gunn, IV
Represented By: William Davis Frye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DTD HC, LLC
Represented By: William Davis Frye
Represented By: George Clanton Gunn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D&N, LLC
Represented By: George Clanton Gunn, IV
Represented By: William Davis Frye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald T. Denz
Represented By: George Clanton Gunn, IV
Represented By: William Davis Frye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norbert A. Bennett
Represented By: William Davis Frye
Represented By: George Clanton Gunn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC
Represented By: George Clanton Gunn, IV
Represented By: William Davis Frye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?