Mississippi State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People et al v. State Board of Election Commissioners et al
Plaintiff: Mississippi State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Dr. Andrea Wesley, Dr. Joseph Wesley, Robert Evans, Gary Fredericks and Pamela Hammer
Defendant: State Board of Election Commissioners, Tate Reeves, Lynn Fitch, Michael Watson, Dan Eubanks and Dean Kirby
Intervenor Defendant: Mississippi Republican Executive Committee
Case Number: 3:2022cv00734
Filed: December 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
2 Judge: Halil S Ozerden
3 Judge: Leslie Southwick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Subpoena Returned Executed as to Ben, Collins, James Booth, MS SJLCRR, Jim Beckett, Dan Eubanks, Dean Kirby. (Tom, Joshua)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA by Robert Evans, Gary Fredericks, Pamela Hammer, Mississippi State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Andrea Wesley, Joseph Wesley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SDT - Ben Collins, #2 Exhibit SDT - Dan Eubanks, #3 Exhibit SDT - MS SJLCRR, #4 Exhibit SDT - James Booth, #5 Exhibit SDT - Jim Beckett, #6 Exhibit SDT - Dean Kirby)(Tom, Joshua)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to Doc. #45 : Incorrect form/event chosen. A Notice of Service of Discovery was used and the event docketed was Notice (other). A Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena should have been prepared and docketed instead. Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. Rule 45(a)(4) [production of documents, electronically stored information, tangible things, or inspection of premises before trial], a notice and copy of the subpoena must be served on each party. When filing the notice of intent to serve on a party(s), the attorney shall attach a copy of the subpoena as an exhibit to the notice. Attorney is directed to refile using the correct form and event: Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena. (VM)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #46 #47 #48 #49 #50 #51 : Incorrect event chosen for these entries. These entries were docketed as Affidavit of Service, but should have been docketed as Subpoena Returned. A return on subpoena also should not be filed without the first page, as issued, preceding the return. Attorney is directed to refile. (VM)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 **ERROR** Disregard this entry. AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena Duces Tecum served on Ben Collins on 6/27/23, filed by Robert Evans, Gary Fredericks, Pamela Hammer, Mississippi State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Andrea Wesley, Joseph Wesley. (Tom, Joshua) Modified on 6/28/2023 (VM).
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 **ERROR** Disregard this entry. AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena Duces Tecum served on James Booth on 6/27/23, filed by Robert Evans, Gary Fredericks, Pamela Hammer, Mississippi State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Andrea Wesley, Joseph Wesley. (Tom, Joshua) Modified on 6/28/2023 (VM).
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 **ERROR** Disregard this entry. AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena Duces Tecum served on Mississippi State Standing Joint Legislative Committee on Reapportionment and Redistricting on 6/27/23, filed by Robert Evans, Gary Fredericks, Pamela Hammer, Mississippi State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Andrea Wesley, Joseph Wesley. (Tom, Joshua) Modified on 6/28/2023 (VM).
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 **ERROR** Disregard this entry. AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena Duces Tecum served on Jim Beckett on 6/27/23, filed by Robert Evans, Gary Fredericks, Pamela Hammer, Mississippi State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Andrea Wesley, Joseph Wesley. (Tom, Joshua) Modified on 6/28/2023 (VM).
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 **ERROR** Disregard this entry. AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena Duces Tecum served on Dan Eubanks on 6/27/23, filed by Robert Evans, Gary Fredericks, Pamela Hammer, Mississippi State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Andrea Wesley, Joseph Wesley. (Tom, Joshua) Modified on 6/28/2023 (VM).
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 **ERROR** Disregard this entry. AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena Duces Tecum served on Dean Kirby on 6/27/23, filed by Robert Evans, Gary Fredericks, Pamela Hammer, Mississippi State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Andrea Wesley, Joseph Wesley. (Tom, Joshua) Modified on 6/28/2023 (VM).
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 **ERROR** Disregard this entry. NOTICE of Service of Document Subpoenas by Robert Evans, Gary Fredericks, Pamela Hammer, Mississippi State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Andrea Wesley, Joseph Wesley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Ben Collins, #2 Exhibit B Dan Eubanks, #3 Exhibit C MS SJLCRR, #4 Exhibit D James Booth, #5 Exhibit E Jim Beckett, #6 Exhibit F Dean Kirby)(Tom, Joshua) Modified on 6/28/2023 (VM).
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying #37 Motion to Set Deadlines; granting #40 Motion for Expedited Trial as set out in the Order. The new deadlines and hearing dates will be set out in a separate docket entry to follow. The parties are instructed to contact the Chambers of Judge Ball within seven days of this Order to set the case for a Case Management Conference. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on June 23, 2023. (SP)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings: Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by August 28, 2023; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by October 16, 2023; Discovery due by December 11, 2023; and Dispositive Motions due by December 22, 2023. Pretrial Conference set for January 25, 2024 at 10:00 AM in Chambers 5.750 (Jackson) Jordan before Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III. Bench Trial set to begin on February 26, 2024 (ELT: 10 days) at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 5A (Jackson) Jordan before Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III.(SP)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE of Service of Disclosure by Mississippi Republican Executive Committee (Cowan, Charles)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #42 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney James A. Nortey - PHV, II terminated. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 5/31/2023 (MAM)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Robert Evans, Gary Fredericks, Pamela Hammer, Mississippi State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Andrea Wesley, Joseph Wesley (Nortey - PHV, James)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #40 MOTION for Expedited Trial filed by Robert Evans, Gary Fredericks, Pamela Hammer, Mississippi State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Andrea Wesley, Joseph Wesley (Tom, Joshua)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION for Expedited Trial by Robert Evans, Gary Fredericks, Pamela Hammer, Mississippi State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Andrea Wesley, Joseph Wesley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proposed Case Management Order)(Tom, Joshua)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures by Robert Evans, Gary Fredericks, Pamela Hammer, Mississippi State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Andrea Wesley, Joseph Wesley (Tom, Joshua)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Joinder in Document by Mississippi Republican Executive Committee to #37 MOTION to Set Deadlines filed by Lynn Fitch, State Board of Election Commissioners, Tate Reeves, Michael Watson (Cowan, Charles)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION to Set Deadlines by Lynn Fitch, Tate Reeves, State Board of Election Commissioners, Michael Watson (Beckett, P.)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Lynn Fitch, Tate Reeves, State Board of Election Commissioners, Michael Watson (Beckett, P.)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 5/26/2023. (JEJ)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Stipulation and Order Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("Stipulation" or "Order"). Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 5/26/2023. (JEJ)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER. This case came before the undersigned for a telephonic case management conference (TCMC) on 5/18/2023. Appearing: Joshua Tom, John Lavelle, David Rollins-Boyd, Jennifer Nwachukwu, Rob McDuff, Ryan Beckett, Tommie Cardin, Parker Berry, Rex Shannon, and Mike Wallace. During the conference, the undersigned asked whether any party objected to the motion to intervene #32 filed by the Mississippi Republican Executive Committee, and counsel advised that no party objects to the motion #32 . Having considered the motion and being advised that no party objects to the motion, the undersigned finds that the motion #32 should be and is hereby granted. The Mississippi Republican Executive Committee (MREC) is hereby added as a defendant. In accordance with the motion #32 , the answer #28 will be treated as adopted by MREC, and the Court orders MREC to comply with the pre-discovery disclosure requirements of Fed.R.Civ.R. 26(a)(1) and L.U.Civ.R. 16(d) and 26(a) by 6/19/2023. Further, the Court orders that by 5/26/2023: (1) Counsel must submit by email to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov a proposed ESI protocol or an explanation as to why counsel could not agree on an ESI protocol; and (2) The parties must file a motion proposing a scheduling order (including trial date) and stating their reasons for requesting the dates in their proposed scheduling order. The parties are not to file responses to these motions; the Court will enter a scheduling order (including trial date) after considering the proposals submitted by the parties in their respective motions. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 5/19/2023 (JEJ)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 5/18/2023 in Jackson, MS. (JEJ)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles E. Cowan on behalf of Mississippi Republican Executive Committee (Cowan, Charles)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION to Intervene by Mississippi Republican Executive Committee (Wallace, Michael)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 5/18/2023 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ) Modified on 4/27/2023 (JEJ).
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying #17 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying #17 Motion to Dismiss; granting #26 Motion To Lift Stay of Discovery as set out in the Order. The parties must contact United States Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball within seven days of this Order to set the case for case-management conference. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on April 11, 2023. (SP)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B. McDuff on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McDuff, Robert)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ANSWER to #27 Amended Complaint, by Lynn Fitch, Tate Reeves, State Board of Election Commissioners, Michael Watson.(Shannon-State Gov, Rex)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief against Dan Eubanks, Lynn Fitch, Dean Kirby, Tate Reeves, State Board of Election Commissioners, Michael Watson, filed by Pamela Hammer, Joseph Wesley, Andrea Wesley, Robert Evans, Mississippi State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Gary Fredericks.(Tom, Joshua)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION To Lift Stay of Discovery re Order Staying Discovery, by Robert Evans, Gary Fredericks, Pamela Hammer, Mississippi State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Andrea Wesley, Joseph Wesley (Tom, Joshua)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Docket Annotation as to Doc. #25 : Multiple documents filed as one pleading. This document includes a response and a motion. Any motion must be an item docketed separately from a response. Attorney is directed to file the remaining document (using the same PDF document) by selecting the correct event. (VM)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction due to Lack of Standing and Eleventh Amendment Sovereign Immunity MOTION to Dismiss due to Legislative Immunity filed by Robert Evans, Gary Fredericks, Pamela Hammer, Mississippi State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Andrea Wesley, Joseph Wesley (Tom, Joshua)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Attorney Jon Greenbaum be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Plaintiffs in association with local counsel conditioned upon completion of the registration procedures found on the Courts website and at the following link: https://www.mssd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-page. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 2/22/2023. (JEJ)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Robert Evans, Gary Fredericks, Pamela Hammer, Mississippi State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Andrea Wesley, Joseph Wesley (Tom, Joshua)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for Jon Greenbaum to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-5049902) by Robert Evans, Gary Fredericks, Pamela Hammer, Mississippi State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Andrea Wesley, Joseph Wesley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Service)(Tom, Joshua)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY pursuant to L.U.Civ.R. 16(b)(3)(B) pending a decision on the Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction due to Lack of Standing and Eleventh Amendment Sovereign Immunity, MOTION to Dismiss due to Legislative Immunity by Dan Eubanks, Dean Kirby at docket #17 . No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 2/14/2023. (JEJ)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Parker Berry on behalf of Dan Eubanks, Lynn Fitch, Dean Kirby, Tate Reeves, State Board of Election Commissioners, Michael Watson (Berry, Brian)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Tommie S. Cardin on behalf of Dan Eubanks, Lynn Fitch, Dean Kirby, Tate Reeves, State Board of Election Commissioners, Michael Watson (Cardin, Tommie)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by P. Ryan Beckett on behalf of Dan Eubanks, Lynn Fitch, Dean Kirby, Tate Reeves, State Board of Election Commissioners, Michael Watson (Beckett, P.)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Separate ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Lynn Fitch, Tate Reeves, State Board of Election Commissioners, Michael Watson.(Shannon-State Gov, Rex)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction due to Lack of Standing and Eleventh Amendment Sovereign Immunity MOTION to Dismiss due to Legislative Immunity filed by Dan Eubanks, Dean Kirby (Shannon-State Gov, Rex)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction due to Lack of Standing and Eleventh Amendment Sovereign Immunity, MOTION to Dismiss due to Legislative Immunity by Dan Eubanks, Dean Kirby (Shannon-State Gov, Rex)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Attorneys John Lavelle, Jr., James Nortey and Drew Cleary Jordan be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Plaintiffs in association with local counsel conditioned upon completion of the registration procedures found on the Courts website and at the following link: https://www.mssd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-page. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 2/6/2023. (JEJ)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee paid by John Lavelle $ 100, receipt number AMSSDC-5039221. (KNS)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Drew Cleary Jordan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-5039259) by Robert Evans, Gary Fredericks, Pamela Hammer, Mississippi State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Andrea Wesley, Joseph Wesley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Service)(Tom, Joshua)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for James Nortey to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-5039251) by Robert Evans, Gary Fredericks, Pamela Hammer, Mississippi State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Andrea Wesley, Joseph Wesley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Service)(Tom, Joshua)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for John Lavelle, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert Evans, Gary Fredericks, Pamela Hammer, Mississippi State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Andrea Wesley, Joseph Wesley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Service)(Tom, Joshua)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Attorneys Jennifer Nwachukwu, Marlin David Rollins-Boyd and Ezra D. Rosenberg be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Plaintiffs in association with local counsel conditioned upon completion of the registration procedures found on the Courts website and at the following link: https://www.mssd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-page. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 1/17/2023. (JEJ)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Ezra D. Rosenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-5022516) by Robert Evans, Gary Fredericks, Pamela Hammer, Mississippi State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Andrea Wesley, Joseph Wesley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Service)(Tom, Joshua)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Marlin David Rollins-Boyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-5022514) by Robert Evans, Gary Fredericks, Pamela Hammer, Mississippi State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Andrea Wesley, Joseph Wesley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Service)(Tom, Joshua)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Jennifer Nwachukwu to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-5022486) by Robert Evans, Gary Fredericks, Pamela Hammer, Mississippi State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Andrea Wesley, Joseph Wesley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Service)(Tom, Joshua)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #11 #12 and #13 : Attorney is advised to include the newly assigned judges' initials (DPJ-HSO-LHS) in the case style on all future filed pleadings: 3:22-cv-734-DPJ-HSO-LHS. A three-judge court was assigned in this matter on December 21, 2022. (VM)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pamela Hammer, Joseph Wesley, Andrea Wesley, Robert Evans, Mississippi State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Gary Fredericks. Answer due 01/11/2023. (Tom, Joshua) Modified on 1/10/2023 (KNS).
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #5 : Incorrectly filed. Summons returned executed correctly filed as Doc. 10. (KNS)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #s [6,7,8,9]: These docket entries fail to select all filing parties. Clerks office will edit these docket entries to include all appropriate filing parties. Attorney is directed to select all filing parties in future filings. (KNS)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #6 #7 and #8 : A three-judge court was assigned in this matter on December 21, 2022. The parties/attorneys are reminded to use the newly assigned judges' initials in all future filings: 3:22-cv-734-DPJ-HSO-LHS. (VM)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #9 : Missing case number and judge assignment. Parties/Attorneys are reminded that the case style should include the complete case number and correct judge assignment on future filed pleadings. (VM)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Attorneys Ming Cheung, Kelsey A. Miller, Patricia Yan and Ari Savitzky be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Plaintiffs in association with local counsel conditioned upon completion of the registration procedures found on the Courts website and at the following link: https://www.mssd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-page. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 1/9/2023. (JEJ)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Ari Savitzky to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-5017629) by Robert Evans, Gary Fredericks, Pamela Hammer, Mississippi State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Service)(Tom, Joshua) Modified on 1/10/2023 to additional Plaintiffs as filers, Dr. Andrea Wesley, Dr. Joseph Wesley (KNS).
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Patricia Yan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-5017627) by Robert Evans, Gary Fredericks, Pamela Hammer, Mississippi State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Service)(Tom, Joshua) Modified on 1/10/2023 to additional Plaintiffs as filers, Dr. Andrea Wesley, Dr. Joseph Wesley (KNS).
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Kelsey A. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-5017622) by Robert Evans, Gary Fredericks, Pamela Hammer, Mississippi State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Service)(Tom, Joshua) Modified on 1/10/2023 to additional Plaintiffs as filers, Dr. Andrea Wesley, Dr. Joseph Wesley (KNS).
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Ming Cheung to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-5017611) by Robert Evans, Gary Fredericks, Pamela Hammer, Mississippi State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Service)(Tom, Joshua) Modified on 1/10/2023 to additional Plaintiffs as filers, Dr. Andrea Wesley, Dr. Joseph Wesley (KNS).
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pamela Hammer, Joseph Wesley, Andrea Wesley, Robert Evans, Mississippi State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Gary Fredericks. All Defendants. (Tom, Joshua) Modified on 1/10/2023 (KNS).
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 **ERROR** Disregard this entry. SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pamela Hammer, Joseph Wesley, Andrea Wesley, Robert Evans, Mississippi State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Gary Fredericks. All Defendants. (Tom, Joshua) Modified on 1/4/2023 (VM).
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #4 : A return on summons should not be filed without the first page, as issued, preceding the return. Attorney is directed to refile. (VM)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER CONSTITUTING THREE-JUDGE COURT. Signed by PRISCILLA RICHMAN, CHIEF JUDGE, UNITED STATES COURT OF APPEALS on 12/21/2022 (KNS)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Circuit Judge Leslie Southwick and District Judge Halil S. Ozerden added. Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball no longer assigned to case. (KNS)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to NEF of 12/21/2022 - Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball was incorrectly deleted. (KNS)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Parties/Attorneys are to use the newly assigned judges in future filings, 3:22-cv-734-DPJ-HSO-LHS. (KNS)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Dan Eubanks, Lynn Fitch, Dean Kirby, Tate Reeves, State Board of Election Commissioners, Michael Watson. (KNS)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Dan Eubanks, Lynn Fitch, Dean Kirby, Tate Reeves, State Board of Election Commissioners, Michael Watson ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSSDC-5008322), filed by Pamela Hammer, Joseph Wesley, Andrea Wesley, Robert Evans, Mississippi State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Gary Fredericks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mississippi State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People et al v. State Board of Election Commissioners et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mississippi State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People
Represented By: Joshua F. Tom
Represented By: Ari J. Savitzky - PHV
Represented By: Ezra D. Rosenberg - PHV
Represented By: Kelsey A. Miller - PHV
Represented By: Ming Cheung - PHV
Represented By: Patricia Jia Yan - PHV
Represented By: John Patrick Lavelle - PHV, Jr.
Represented By: Marlin David Rollins-Boyd - PHV
Represented By: James A. Nortey - PHV, II
Represented By: Jennifer Nwachukwu - PHV
Represented By: Drew Cleary Jordan - PHV
Represented By: Jon Greenbaum - PHV
Represented By: Robert B. McDuff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Andrea Wesley
Represented By: Joshua F. Tom
Represented By: Ezra D. Rosenberg - PHV
Represented By: James A. Nortey - PHV, II
Represented By: Patricia Jia Yan - PHV
Represented By: Ari J. Savitzky - PHV
Represented By: Drew Cleary Jordan - PHV
Represented By: Marlin David Rollins-Boyd - PHV
Represented By: Ming Cheung - PHV
Represented By: Jennifer Nwachukwu - PHV
Represented By: John Patrick Lavelle - PHV, Jr.
Represented By: Kelsey A. Miller - PHV
Represented By: Jon Greenbaum - PHV
Represented By: Robert B. McDuff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Joseph Wesley
Represented By: Joshua F. Tom
Represented By: Ming Cheung - PHV
Represented By: Patricia Jia Yan - PHV
Represented By: Drew Cleary Jordan - PHV
Represented By: Ezra D. Rosenberg - PHV
Represented By: Ari J. Savitzky - PHV
Represented By: James A. Nortey - PHV, II
Represented By: Jennifer Nwachukwu - PHV
Represented By: John Patrick Lavelle - PHV, Jr.
Represented By: Kelsey A. Miller - PHV
Represented By: Marlin David Rollins-Boyd - PHV
Represented By: Jon Greenbaum - PHV
Represented By: Robert B. McDuff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Evans
Represented By: Joshua F. Tom
Represented By: John Patrick Lavelle - PHV, Jr.
Represented By: Kelsey A. Miller - PHV
Represented By: Marlin David Rollins-Boyd - PHV
Represented By: Ming Cheung - PHV
Represented By: Ari J. Savitzky - PHV
Represented By: Drew Cleary Jordan - PHV
Represented By: Ezra D. Rosenberg - PHV
Represented By: James A. Nortey - PHV, II
Represented By: Jennifer Nwachukwu - PHV
Represented By: Patricia Jia Yan - PHV
Represented By: Jon Greenbaum - PHV
Represented By: Robert B. McDuff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Fredericks
Represented By: Joshua F. Tom
Represented By: Ezra D. Rosenberg - PHV
Represented By: Ari J. Savitzky - PHV
Represented By: James A. Nortey - PHV, II
Represented By: Drew Cleary Jordan - PHV
Represented By: Jennifer Nwachukwu - PHV
Represented By: John Patrick Lavelle - PHV, Jr.
Represented By: Kelsey A. Miller - PHV
Represented By: Marlin David Rollins-Boyd - PHV
Represented By: Ming Cheung - PHV
Represented By: Patricia Jia Yan - PHV
Represented By: Jon Greenbaum - PHV
Represented By: Robert B. McDuff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Hammer
Represented By: Joshua F. Tom
Represented By: Jennifer Nwachukwu - PHV
Represented By: Ming Cheung - PHV
Represented By: Marlin David Rollins-Boyd - PHV
Represented By: John Patrick Lavelle - PHV, Jr.
Represented By: Kelsey A. Miller - PHV
Represented By: Ari J. Savitzky - PHV
Represented By: Drew Cleary Jordan - PHV
Represented By: Ezra D. Rosenberg - PHV
Represented By: James A. Nortey - PHV, II
Represented By: Patricia Jia Yan - PHV
Represented By: Jon Greenbaum - PHV
Represented By: Robert B. McDuff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Board of Election Commissioners
Represented By: P. Ryan Beckett
Represented By: Rex M. Shannon-State Gov, III
Represented By: Tommie S. Cardin
Represented By: Brian Parker Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate Reeves
Represented By: P. Ryan Beckett
Represented By: Rex M. Shannon-State Gov, III
Represented By: Tommie S. Cardin
Represented By: Brian Parker Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Fitch
Represented By: Tommie S. Cardin
Represented By: Brian Parker Berry
Represented By: P. Ryan Beckett
Represented By: Rex M. Shannon-State Gov, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Watson
Represented By: Rex M. Shannon-State Gov, III
Represented By: Tommie S. Cardin
Represented By: Brian Parker Berry
Represented By: P. Ryan Beckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Eubanks
Represented By: Tommie S. Cardin
Represented By: Brian Parker Berry
Represented By: P. Ryan Beckett
Represented By: Rex M. Shannon-State Gov, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Kirby
Represented By: Tommie S. Cardin
Represented By: P. Ryan Beckett
Represented By: Brian Parker Berry
Represented By: Rex M. Shannon-State Gov, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Mississippi Republican Executive Committee
Represented By: Michael B. Wallace
Represented By: Charles E. Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?