Golden v. Mississippi Baptist Medical Center, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Karen Green Golden
Defendant: Mississippi Baptist Medical Center, Inc., Mattie Miller, Elizabeth Foresman, The Schumacher Group of Delaware, Inc., Mississippi Physicians LLP, Shunte Jones and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 3:2022cv00739
Filed: December 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Kristi H Johnson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1395 Emergency Medical Treatment & Active Labor Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2023 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by The Schumacher Group of Delaware, Inc..(Upchurch, David)
February 16, 2023 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Mississippi Physicians LLP.(Upchurch, David)
February 16, 2023 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Shunte Jones.(Upchurch, David)
February 9, 2023 Filing 18 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Mattie Miller and Elizabeth Foresman, R.N. by Mississippi Baptist Medical Center, Inc. (Graham, Dudley)
February 7, 2023 Filing 17 Separate ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Mississippi Baptist Medical Center, Inc..(Graham, Dudley)
January 26, 2023 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading to the Complaint by Shunte Jones, Mississippi Physicians LLP, The Schumacher Group of Delaware, Inc. (Upchurch, David)
January 26, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by David Walker Upchurch on behalf of Shunte Jones, Mississippi Physicians LLP, The Schumacher Group of Delaware, Inc. (Upchurch, David)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Text-only ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint. Mississippi Baptist Medical Center, Inc. answer due 2/13/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 2/26/23. (No further written order will be issued.) (dfk)
January 25, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen Green Golden. Mattie Miller served on 1/17/2023, answer due 2/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Return Receipt Card)(Osborne, Clarence) Modified on 1/25/2023 (KNS).
January 25, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen Green Golden. Elizabeth Foresman served on 1/18/2023, answer due 2/8/2023. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Return Receipt Card)(Osborne, Clarence)
January 25, 2023 Filing 12 ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen Green Golden. Elizabeth Foresman served on 1/17/2023, answer due 2/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Return Receipt Card)(Osborne, Clarence) Modified on 1/25/2023 (KNS).
January 25, 2023 Filing 11 ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen Green Golden. Mattie Miller served on 1/17/2023, answer due 2/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Return Receipt Card)(Osborne, Clarence) Modified on 1/25/2023 (KNS).
January 25, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #12 : There is an error in this entry. It has been correctly refiled as Doc. 13. (KNS)
January 25, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #11 : There is an error in this entry. Document has been refiled as Doc. 14. (KNS)
January 24, 2023 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint by Mississippi Baptist Medical Center, Inc. (Graham, Dudley)
January 20, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen Green Golden. The Schumacher Group of Delaware, Inc. served on 1/5/2023, answer due 1/26/2023. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Return Receipt Card)(Osborne, Clarence)
January 17, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Heber S. Simmons, III on behalf of Karen Green Golden (Simmons, Heber)
January 17, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Aubrey Bryan Smith, III on behalf of Karen Green Golden (Smith, Aubrey)
January 17, 2023 Filing 6 ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY***NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Karen Green Golden (Smith, Aubrey) Modified on 1/17/2023 (KNS).
January 17, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #6 : Document filed in error. It should be disregarded. (KNS)
January 17, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #7 : Attorney is advised to include the correct judge assignment KHJ-FKB on future filed pleadings. (KNS)
January 17, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #8 : Attorney is advised to include the correct judge assignment KHJ-FKB on future filed pleadings. (KNS)
January 9, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen Green Golden. Shunte Jones served on 1/3/2023, answer due 1/24/2023. (Osborne, Clarence)
January 9, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen Green Golden. Mississippi Baptist Medical Center, Inc. served on 1/3/2023, answer due 1/24/2023. (Osborne, Clarence)
January 9, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #5 : Scanned document contains blank pages. PDF documents should be checked for errors before filing. Additionally, in future of returns, the summons should be filed as issued, first page preceding the return. It is not necessary to refile. (KNS)
January 3, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen Green Golden. Mississippi Physicians LLP served on 1/3/2023, answer due 1/24/2023. (Osborne, Clarence)
December 21, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Elizabeth Foresman, Shunte Jones, Mattie Miller, Mississippi Baptist Medical Center, Inc., Mississippi Physicians LLP, The Schumacher Group of Delaware, Inc. (KNS) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/21/2022) (KNS). Modified on 12/21/2022 to correct Foresman's Summons(KNS).
December 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Elizabeth Foresman, John Does 1-10, Shunte Jones, Mattie Miller, Mississippi Baptist Medical Center, Inc., Mississippi Physicians LLP, The Schumacher Group of Delaware, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSSDC-5009177), filed by Karen Green Golden. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golden v. Mississippi Baptist Medical Center, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Green Golden
Represented By: Clarence Michael Osborne
Represented By: Aubrey Bryan Smith, III
Represented By: Heber S. Simmons, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Baptist Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: Dudley Collier Graham, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mattie Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Foresman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Schumacher Group of Delaware, Inc.
Represented By: David Walker Upchurch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Physicians LLP
Represented By: David Walker Upchurch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shunte Jones
Represented By: David Walker Upchurch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?