Holifield v. Signature Insurance Agency et al
Plaintiff: Bianca Holifield
Defendant: Signature Insurance Agency, Southern Cross Underwriters doing business as SCU doing business as CRC Insurance Services, Inc., Southern Cross Underwriters, Inc., Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, John Doe Person(s) 1-5, John Doe Corporation(s) 1-5 and John Doe Entity(ies) 1-5
Case Number: 3:2023cv00494
Filed: July 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: LaKeysha Greer Isaac
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2023 Filing 16 Letter from Arthur Johnston, Clerk to Hinds County Circuit Clerk transmitting certified copies of Order of Remand and Docket Sheet. (KNS)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF REMAND. Plaintif's Motion to Remand, Doc. No. 6, is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 9/27/2023 (KNS)
September 12, 2023 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand filed by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company (Heidelberg, Cecil)
September 12, 2023 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand filed by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complain for Declaratory Judgment, #2 Exhibit B- Declarations Page for Progressive Gulf policy, #3 Exhibit C- Southern Cross Articles of Merger, #4 Exhibit D- Underlying Complaint filed in Scott Co.)(Heidelberg, Cecil)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The new deadline is 9/12/2023. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 9/7/23. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE ON THIS MOTION. (AC)
September 5, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Remand by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company (Heidelberg, Cecil)
September 5, 2023 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand filed by Southern Cross Underwriters (Kidd, Dean)
August 28, 2023 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Southern Cross Underwriters (Kidd, Dean)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 8/22/23 (NL)
August 22, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #6 #7 and #8 : The case style should include the complete case number and correct judge assignment on futurefiled pleadings (3:23-cv-494-CWR-LGI). Also, U.L.Cr.R.47(B) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings. (VM)
August 22, 2023 Set/Reset Hearings:, ***Deadlines/Hearings terminated. TERMINATED TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 9-13-23. (NL)
August 21, 2023 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bianca Holifield (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Branson, Raju-Aundre')
August 21, 2023 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bianca Holifield (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Branson, Raju-Aundre')
August 21, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand by Bianca Holifield (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Branson, Raju-Aundre')
August 7, 2023 Filing 5 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2023 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to isaac_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. The parties are instructed to use the following Dial-in Number for the Conference: (888) 684-8852 PASSCODE: 3566012 (PLEASE NOTE: Parties are directed to use the Case Management Order Form 1 found on the website of the US District Court for the Southern District of MS - Form Last Updated: Jan 2022)(NL)
August 7, 2023 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Southern Cross Underwriters (Kidd, Dean)
August 7, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Southern Cross Underwriters (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Insurance Policy)(Kidd, Dean)
August 7, 2023 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company (Heidelberg, Cecil)
July 31, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Southern Cross Underwriters from Hinds County Circuit Court, case number 25CI1:23-cv-152-WLK. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSSDC-5173347) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents served upon Defendant, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(PG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holifield v. Signature Insurance Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bianca Holifield
Represented By: Raju-Aundre' Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signature Insurance Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Cross Underwriters doing business as SCU doing business as CRC Insurance Services, Inc.
Represented By: Dean Sterling Kidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Cross Underwriters, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Gulf Insurance Company
Represented By: Cecil Maison Heidelberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Person(s) 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporation(s) 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Entity(ies) 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?