Musser v. American Express National Bank et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Musser
Defendant: American Express National Bank, Huntington National Bank, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC and Trans Union, LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv03030
Filed: October 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: LaKeysha Greer Isaac
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2023 Filing 22 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Equifax Information Services, LLC by Matthew Musser (Kittell, Christopher)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY and CANCELLING CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 12/18/2023 (NL)
December 15, 2023 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Ridgeway, Shauncey)
December 15, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and STAY action by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Dan Smith)(Ridgeway, Shauncey). Added MOTION to Stay Case on 12/15/2023 (ND).
December 1, 2023 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by American Express National Bank.(Mulholland, Daniel)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. Defendant, American Express National Bank is hereby granted an extension of time until Friday, December 1, 2023 to respond to plaintiff's complaint. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 11/30/2023 (NL)
November 27, 2023 Filing 17 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,, by American Express National Bank (Mulholland, Daniel)
November 20, 2023 TEXT ONLY ORDER: The Case Management Conference set for December 14, 2023 has been cancelled by the Court and reset to January 16, 2024 by the Rule 16(a) Initial Order entered on November 14, 2023. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. (NL)
November 14, 2023 Filing 16 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2024 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to isaac_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. The parties are instructed to use the following Dial-in Number for the Conference: (888) 684-8852 PASSCODE: 3566012 (PLEASE NOTE: Parties are directed to use the Case Management Order Form 1 found on the website of the US District Court for the Southern District of MS - Form Last Updated: Jan 2022). (NL)
November 13, 2023 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Huntington National Bank (Stover, Joshua)
November 13, 2023 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Huntington National Bank.(Stover, Joshua)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. American Express National Bank answer due 11/27/2023. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 11/13/23 (NL)
November 10, 2023 Filing 13 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,, by American Express National Bank (Mulholland, Daniel)
November 6, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Settlement by Equifax Information Services, LLC (Parrott, Evan)
October 31, 2023 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Express National Bank (Mulholland, Daniel)
October 31, 2023 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Trans Union, LLC with Prejudice by Matthew Musser (Kittell, Christopher)
October 30, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Ridgeway, Shauncey)
October 30, 2023 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Ridgeway, Shauncey)
October 30, 2023 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax, Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Parrott, Evan)
October 30, 2023 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,, or other Response to Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC (Parrott, Evan)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal. American Express National Bank answer due 11/13/2023. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 10/30/2023 (MJ)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal. Defendant Huntington National Bank Response due by 11/13/2023. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 10/30/2023 (MJ) Modified on 10/30/2023 (MJ).
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, or other Response to Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Answer due 11/6/2023. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 10/30/2023 (MJ)
October 27, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal,,, by Huntington National Bank (Stover, Joshua)
October 27, 2023 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,, by American Express National Bank (Mulholland, Daniel)
October 25, 2023 Filing 3 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2023 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to isaac_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. The parties are instructed to use the following Dial-in Number for the Conference: (888) 684-8852 PASSCODE: 3566012 (PLEASE NOTE: Parties are directed to use the Case Management Order Form 1 found on the website of the US District Court for the Southern District of MS - Form Last Updated: Jan 2022). (NL)
October 24, 2023 Filing 2 Letter sent to Katherine Carlton Robinson, Esq. on 10/24/2023 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (LAT)
October 23, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. from Hinds County Circuit Court, MS, case number 25CI1:23-cv-526-DHG. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSSDC-5250153) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court File, #2 Exhibit B- Amex Consent, #3 Exhibit C- Huntington Consent, #4 Exhibit D- Equifax Consent, #5 Exhibit E-TransUnion Consent, #6 Exhibit F- State Court, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT) (Attachment 7 replaced on 10/24/2023) (LAT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Musser v. American Express National Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Musser
Represented By: Christopher E. Kittell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express National Bank
Represented By: Daniel J. Mulholland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington National Bank
Represented By: Joshua W. Stover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Shauncey Hunter Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Evan N. Parrott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?