Leggett v. Hinds County Raymond Jail et al
Plaintiff: Deshun R. Leggett
Defendant: Hinds County Raymond Jail, Tyree Jones, Hinds County Officers, Hinds County, Mississippi, Lt. Tyler and Sgt. Herb
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2023cv03105
Filed: November 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Tom S Lee
Referring Judge: Robert P Myers
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2024 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Hinds County, Mississippi on January 17, 2024. Waiver of Service due by 3/18/2024. (KNS)
January 17, 2024 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Sgt. Herb on January 17, 2024. Waiver of Service due by 3/18/2024. (KNS)
January 17, 2024 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Lt. Tyler on January 17, 2024. Waiver of Service due by 3/18/2024. (KNS)
January 17, 2024 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Tyree Jones on January 17, 2024. Waiver of Service due by 3/18/2024. (KNS)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER : Clerk is directed to issue a Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons For Defendants Tyree Jones; Lt. Tyler; Sgt. Herb; and Hinds County,Mississippi. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 1/17/2024 (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons to Tyree Jones, #2 Attachment - Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons to Lt. Tyler, #3 Attachment Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons to Sgt. Herb, #4 Attachment Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons to Hinds County, Mississippi, #5 Attachment Waiver of the Service of Summons Form)(KNS)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER AMENDING DOCKET. IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall replace Defendant Hinds County Officers with Lt. Tyler and Sgt. Herb as Defendants herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 1/17/2024 (KNS)
January 17, 2024 Filing 12 Response to Order re #10 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND, filed by Deshun R. Leggett. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CO)
January 8, 2024 Partial Payment of Filing fee made by: Plaintiff Deshun R. Leggett $.50, receipt number 6994, copy of docket entry mailed to plaintiff. (CO)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER AMENDING DOCKET - IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall replace Hinds County Raymond Jail with Hinds County, Mississippi, as Defendant herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 01/04/2024 (CO)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND: Plaintiff shall file a written response consistent with this Order by January 18, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 1/4/2024 (CRT)
December 22, 2023 Filing 9 Response to Order re #8 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND, filed by Deshun R. Leggett. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CO)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND: Plaintiff shall file a written response consistent with this order by December 28, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 12/14/2023 (CRT)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 #5 Motions for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 12/14/2023 (CRT)
December 11, 2023 Filing 6 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #4 Order Opsp2, Acknowledgement filed by Deshun R. Leggett. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CO)
December 4, 2023 Filing 5 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Deshun R. Leggett. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Cover Letter)(LAT)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 1/2/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 11/30/2023 (CRT)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: on or before 12/21/2023, plaintiff shall either pay the required filing fee or file a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 11/21/2023 (CRT)
November 20, 2023 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Deshun R. Leggett. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CO)
November 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hinds County Officers, Hinds County Raymond Jail, Tyree Jones, filed by Deshun R. Leggett. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Supporting Document, #2 Notice of Assignment, #3 Envelope)(CO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leggett v. Hinds County Raymond Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deshun R. Leggett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hinds County Raymond Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyree Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hinds County Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hinds County, Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Herb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?