Stuart C. Irby Company v. Hansen Contracting, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Stuart C. Irby Company
Defendant: Hansen Contracting, Inc. and David Cerutti
Case Number: 3:2023cv03118
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Kristi H Johnson
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants Hansen Contracting, Inc. and David Cerutti filed by Stuart C. Irby Company (Gregory, Haley)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants Hansen Contracting, Inc. and David Cerutti by Stuart C. Irby Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Thomas Box, #2 Exhibit A - Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Material Invoices, #4 Exhibit C - Sales Terms)(Gregory, Haley)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT against defendants David Cerutti and Hansen Contracting, Inc. (ASJ)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Default against Defendants Hansen Contracting, Inc. and David Cerutti by Stuart C. Irby Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Haley F. Gregory)(Gregory, Haley)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stuart C. Irby Company. Hansen Contracting, Inc. served on 12/7/2023, answer due 12/28/2023. (Smith, Caroline)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stuart C. Irby Company. David Cerutti served on 12/7/2023, answer due 12/28/2023. (Smith, Caroline)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Craig Kimball on behalf of Stuart C. Irby Company (Kimball, Brian)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Haley Fowler Gregory on behalf of Stuart C. Irby Company (Gregory, Haley)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to David Cerutti, Hansen Contracting, Inc. (PG)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Cerutti, Hansen Contracting, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMSSDC-5282251), filed by Stuart C. Irby Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Material Invoices, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summary of Material Invoices, #4 Exhibit 4 - Sales Terms, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(PG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stuart C. Irby Company v. Hansen Contracting, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stuart C. Irby Company
Represented By: Caroline B. Smith
Represented By: Brian Craig Kimball
Represented By: Haley Fowler Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hansen Contracting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Cerutti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?