Holifield v. Signature Insurance Agency et al
Plaintiff: Bianca Holifield
Defendant: Signature Insurance Agency, Southern Cross Underwriters doing business as SCU doing business as CRC Insurance Services, Inc., Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, John Doe Person(s) 1-5, Southern Cross Underwriters, Inc., John Doe Corporation(s) 1-5 and John Doe Entity(ies) 1-5
Case Number: 3:2024cv00087
Filed: February 12, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Andrew S Harris
2 Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2024 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File SEALED Document by Southern Cross Underwriters (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration in Support of Amended Motion to Seal.pdf)(Kidd, Dean)
April 5, 2024 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Progressive Agency Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation for Progressive Gulf Insurance Company. (Deliman, Virginia (Ginny))
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER directing Progressive to file a complete Rule 7.1 disclosure statement on or before April 12, 2024, as stated in the Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew S. Harris on April 5, 2024. (DI)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Amending #20 Order on Motion #19 for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 04/04/2024.(KF)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying without prejudice #19 Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 04/04/2024. (KF)
April 3, 2024 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File SEALED Document by Southern Cross Underwriters (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration in Support of Motion)(Kidd, Dean)
April 2, 2024 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #s #17 and #18 : Incorrect linkage made. Rebuttal and Memorandum in Opposition should be linked to Motion to Remand. All related filings to motions (using the "Responses and Replies" category, with the exception of "Response to Order") should be linked back to the original motion. Court staff has made the correction. Additionally, L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings. Also, attorney is directed to include the division number in future filings, 3:24-cv-87-CWR-ASH. (KNS)
April 1, 2024 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re Memorandum in Opposition to #4 Motion to Remand filed by Bianca Holifield (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Branson, Raju-Aundre') Modified on 4/2/2024 (KNS).
April 1, 2024 Filing 17 Rebuttal re Response in Opposition to #4 Motion to Remand filed by Bianca Holifield (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Branson, Raju-Aundre') Modified on 4/2/2024 (KNS).
March 29, 2024 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Strike #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Bianca Holifield (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Branson, Raju-Aundre')
March 29, 2024 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Strike #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Bianca Holifield (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Branson, Raju-Aundre')
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE ON THIS MOTION. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 03/29/2024. (KF)
March 26, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Bianca Holifield (Branson, Raju-Aundre')
March 15, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Virginia (Ginny) Y. Deliman on behalf of Progressive Gulf Insurance Company (Deliman, Virginia (Ginny))
March 15, 2024 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company (Heidelberg, Cecil)
March 15, 2024 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CRC Insurance Services Responses to Progressive's First Set of Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit B - CRC Insurance Services Responses to Progressive Gulf's First Set of Requests for Admissions, #3 Exhibit C - Complaint for Declaratory Judgment filed March 7, 2023, #4 Exhibit D- Southern Cross Articles of Merger dated July 1, 2003, #5 Exhibit E- Declarations Page for Progressive Gulf Policy, #6 Exhibit F- Complaint for wrongful death damages filed in the Circuit Court of Scott Co., MS)(Heidelberg, Cecil)
March 15, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION to Strike #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company (Heidelberg, Cecil)
March 15, 2024 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Southern Cross Underwriters (Kidd, Dean)
March 8, 2024 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bianca Holifield (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Branson, Raju-Aundre')
March 8, 2024 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bianca Holifield (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Branson, Raju-Aundre')
March 8, 2024 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #s #7 and #8 : L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings (KNS)
March 5, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY except for remand-related discovery pending a ruling by the district judge on the Motion to Remand, at docket no. #4 . No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew S. Harris on 3/5/2024. (JEJ)
March 1, 2024 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Southern Cross Underwriters (Kidd, Dean)
March 1, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Southern Cross Underwriters (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Insurance Policy)(Kidd, Dean)
March 1, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Bianca Holifield (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Branson, Raju-Aundre')
March 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Andrew S. Harris for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball no longer assigned to case Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 3/1/24 (MGB)
March 1, 2024 Remark: Parties should include the newly assigned Magistrate Judge's initials ASH on future filings. (MGB)
March 1, 2024 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #4 : L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings. Additionally, division number is to be included in the civil action number, 3:24-cv-87-CWR-ASH. No need to re-file. (KNS)
February 12, 2024 Filing 2 Joinder in Document by Southern Cross Underwriters to #1 Notice of Removal,,, filed by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company (Kidd, Dean)
February 12, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Hinds County, Mississippi, case number 23-152. (Filing fee $405 receipt number AMSSDC-5333631) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court File, #3 Exhibit C - Wrongful Death Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - CRC's Responses to Interrogatories, #5 Exhibit E - CRC's Responses to Requests for Admissions, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holifield v. Signature Insurance Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bianca Holifield
Represented By: Raju-Aundre' Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signature Insurance Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Cross Underwriters doing business as SCU doing business as CRC Insurance Services, Inc.
Represented By: Dean Sterling Kidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Gulf Insurance Company
Represented By: Cecil Maison Heidelberg
Represented By: Virginia (Ginny) Y. Deliman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Person(s) 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Cross Underwriters, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporation(s) 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Entity(ies) 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?