Issaquena and Warren Counties Land Company, LLC et al v. Warren County, Mississippi Board of Supervisors et al
Plaintiff: All plaintiffs, Issaquena and Warren Counties Land Company, LLC, Gary K. Blakeney, Kenneth D. Blakeney, Earnest K. Blakeney, Rose C. Blakeney, Robert D. Ainsworth, Pam Haley, Keith Hawsey, Tommy L. Thrash, Josh L. Thrash, Mike Sutton, Michael R. McTurner, Donna M. McTurner, Ervin Ray, Fay Ray, Gary Ray, Hugh J. Parker, Cynthia B. Parker, Joey Havens and Marty Elrod
Defendant: Carl Flanders, Richard George, W. Richard Johnson, Joseph G. Strickland, John Does 1-100, Paul E. Winfield, David McDonald, William H. Banks, Jr., Charles Selmon, Warren County, Mississippi, Paw Paw Island Land Co., Inc. and John Lindigrin
Counter_claimant: Paw Paw Island Land Co., Inc. and John Lindigrin
Counter_defendant: Marty Elrod
Case Number: 5:2007cv00106
Filed: May 18, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Western Office
County: Warren
Presiding Judge: John M. Roper
Presiding Judge: David C. Bramlette
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 628 ORDER denying 368 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 373 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 374 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 376 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 378 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 396 Motion to Review of Magistrate Judge Order; denying 422 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; denying 425 Motion to Strike ; denying 427 Motion to Strike ; denying 461 Motion in Limine; denying 476 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; denying 495 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 506 Motion in Limine; denying 507 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 565 Motion to Dismiss; denying 567 Motion to Dismiss; denying 579 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 582 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 616 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. All motions denied without prejudice. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 11/8/2012 (ECW)
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 622 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 573 Motion for Discovery; granting 608 Motion to Clarify, and setting deadlines for discovery and supplemental briefing. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 10/26/2012 (ECW)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 563 ORDER. Because all motions by Defendants with regard to discovery and to amend their answer and counterclaims have now been resolved, this matter is in a posture for the Plaintiffs to bring forth those defenses to the new claims reserved to them in this Court's Order 504 .Thus,the Plaintiffs are directed to raise these defenses by a dispositive motion within twenty-one days from this date. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 3/5/12 (dtj)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 540 ORDER denying without prejudice 352 Motion ; granting in part and denying in part 364 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 383 Motion to Review of Magistrate Judge Order; granting in part and denying in part 397 Motion to Review of Magistrate Judge Order; denying 399 Motion for Protective Order; granting 404 Motion for Protective Order; granting 423 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 438 Motion to Compel; denying 439 Motion to Compel; denying 440 Motion to Compel; denying 441 Motion to Compel; denying 442 Motion to Compel; denying 443 Motion to Compel; denying 444 Motion to Compel; denying 445 Motion to Compel; denying 446 Motion to Compel; finding as moot 468 Motion to Strike ; granting 493 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 534 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 230 Motion to Compel Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 12/7/2011 (dtj)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 488 ORDER that this action is stayed, and it appears to be no further reason to maintain this file as an open one for statistical purposes. Nothing contained in this Order shall be considered a dismissal or disposition of this matter, and should further proceedings in it become necessary or desirable, any party may initiate them in the same manner as if this Order had not been entered. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 9/15/09 (PKM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Issaquena and Warren Counties Land Company, LLC et al v. Warren County, Mississippi Board of Supervisors et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Flanders
Represented By: Kenneth B. Rector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard George
Represented By: Kenneth B. Rector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Richard Johnson
Represented By: Kenneth B. Rector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph G. Strickland
Represented By: David M. Sessums
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul E. Winfield
Represented By: Kenneth B. Rector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David McDonald
Represented By: Kenneth B. Rector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William H. Banks, Jr.
Represented By: Kenneth B. Rector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Selmon
Represented By: Kenneth B. Rector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren County, Mississippi
Represented By: Kenneth B. Rector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paw Paw Island Land Co., Inc.
Represented By: Michael O'Mara Gwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Lindigrin
Represented By: Michael O'Mara Gwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All plaintiffs
Represented By: Lisa A. Reppeto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Issaquena and Warren Counties Land Company, LLC
Represented By: Mark D. Herbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary K. Blakeney
Represented By: Lisa A. Reppeto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth D. Blakeney
Represented By: Lisa A. Reppeto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earnest K. Blakeney
Represented By: Lisa A. Reppeto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose C. Blakeney
Represented By: Lisa A. Reppeto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert D. Ainsworth
Represented By: Lisa A. Reppeto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pam Haley
Represented By: Lisa A. Reppeto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Hawsey
Represented By: Lisa A. Reppeto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy L. Thrash
Represented By: Lisa A. Reppeto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh L. Thrash
Represented By: Lisa A. Reppeto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Sutton
Represented By: Lisa A. Reppeto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael R. McTurner
Represented By: Lisa A. Reppeto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna M. McTurner
Represented By: Lisa A. Reppeto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ervin Ray
Represented By: Lisa A. Reppeto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fay Ray
Represented By: Lisa A. Reppeto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Ray
Represented By: Lisa A. Reppeto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugh J. Parker
Represented By: Lisa A. Reppeto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia B. Parker
Represented By: Lisa A. Reppeto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joey Havens
Represented By: Lisa A. Reppeto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marty Elrod
Represented By: Lisa A. Reppeto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Paw Paw Island Land Co., Inc.
Represented By: Michael O'Mara Gwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: John Lindigrin
Represented By: Michael O'Mara Gwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Marty Elrod
Represented By: Lisa A. Reppeto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?