Clay v. Bingham
Plaintiff: Louis J. Clay, Jr.
Defendant: Margaret Bingham
Case Number: 5:2010cv00006
Filed: January 20, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Western Office
County: Wilkinson
Presiding Judge: David C. Bramlette
Presiding Judge: Michael T. Parker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying 13 Motion to Alter Judgment; denying 14 Motion to Alter Judgment; granting 17 Motion to Dismiss; adopting 20 Report and Recommendations; denying 21 Motion to add newly discovered evidence. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 03/28/2011 (ECW)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that pursuant to the order 7 of the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit that the instant civil habeas action be reopened. Respondent, through Attorney General Jim Hood, is to file an answer or other responsive pleading, such as a motion to dismiss, in this cause as to the petitioner's ground one that the state habeas court improperly denied him leave to proceed in forma pauperis in a 2008 proceeding relating to his charge of aggravated assault as a habitual offender in the Circuit Court of Wilkinson County, Mississippi, within 20 days of the service upon the said General Hood of a copy of this order. The Clerk of Court shall serve, by certified mail, a copy of the petition 1 and memorandum in support 3 file d herein, a copy of the order 7 entered by the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit on March 22, 2010, and a copy of this order upon Honorable Jim Hood, Attorney General of the State of Mississippi. The Clerk of Court shall also serve a copy of this order upon petitioner by mailing same to petitioner's last known address. Case reopened. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 4/12/10 (PKM)
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1631, this petition for habeas corpus relief is transferred to the United States Court of Appeals for the FifthCircuit. The Clerk of this Court is directed to close this case pending the decision of the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit. Petitioner's request that the undersigned recuse himself is DENIED. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 1/22/10 (PKM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clay v. Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis J. Clay, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Bingham
Represented By: Jim Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?