McGee v. Willbros Construction (U.S.), LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Brandon McGee |
Defendant: |
Willbros Construction (U.S.), LLC, Willbros USA, Inc., Willbros Group, Inc., Southeast Supply Header, LLC, Centerpoint Energy, Inc., Spectra Energy, Inc., L. D. Ainsworth, Dennis Miller, John Does 2-20 and Willbros RPI, Inc. |
Case Number: |
5:2011cv00080 |
Filed: |
May 20, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi |
Office: |
Western Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
John M. Roper |
Presiding Judge: |
David C. Bramlette |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Personal Injury |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 25, 2012 |
Filing
104
AGREED ORDER of DISMISSAL granting Ore Tenus Motion to Dismiss, without prejudice, Plaintiff's claims against Southeast Supply Header, LLC, with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on September 25, 2012. (lda)
|
February 22, 2012 |
Filing
54
ORDER granting Joint Motion 51 for Entry of Final Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice of Willbros Group, Inc. and Willbros United States Holdings, Inc. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on February 16, 2012.(lda)
|
February 17, 2012 |
Filing
53
ORDER granting 51 Joint Motion for Entry of Final Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice of Willbros Group, Inc. and Willbros United States Holdings, Inc. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on February 16, 2012. (lda)
|
February 7, 2012 |
Filing
46
ORDER granting 44 Motion to Dismiss. Spectra Energy, Inc. and Spectra Energy, Inc. d/b/a Spectra Energy Transmission are hereby dismissed from this action with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on February 2, 2012. (lda)
|
December 27, 2011 |
Filing
36
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 12/27/2011 (PL)
|
October 26, 2011 |
Filing
34
Memorandum Opinion and Order denying 25 MOTION to Remand AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT MOTION to Remand to State Court. Party Michael Herring terminated and dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 10/25/2011 (PL)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: McGee v. Willbros Construction (U.S.), LLC et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Brandon McGee |
Represented By: |
James D. Shannon |
Represented By: |
Eugene M. Harlow |
Represented By: |
Michael G. Berry |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Willbros Construction (U.S.), LLC |
Represented By: |
Jeremy T. Hutto |
Represented By: |
Edward J. Currie, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Willbros USA, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Robert A. Miller |
Represented By: |
Kyle V. Miller |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Willbros Group, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Robert A. Miller |
Represented By: |
Kyle V. Miller |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Southeast Supply Header, LLC |
Represented By: |
Sheldon Givens Alston |
Represented By: |
Lane Williamson Staines |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Centerpoint Energy, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Sheldon Givens Alston |
Represented By: |
Lane Williamson Staines |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Spectra Energy, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Sheldon Givens Alston |
Represented By: |
Lane Williamson Staines |
Represented By: |
Sheldon Givens Alston |
Represented By: |
Lane Williamson Staines |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: L. D. Ainsworth |
Represented By: |
Todd J. Hartley |
Represented By: |
Mark D. Jicka |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Dennis Miller |
Represented By: |
Douglas R. Duke |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: John Does 2-20 |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Willbros RPI, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Edward J. Currie, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Jeremy T. Hutto |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?