Solis v. Thompson et al

Plaintiff: Hilda L. Solis
Defendant: Richard Thompson and Thompson Tree and Spraying Service, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2012cv00052
Filed: April 20, 2012
Court: Mississippi Southern District Court
Office: Western Office
County: Adams
Referring Judge: Robert H. Walker
Presiding Judge: David C. Bramlette
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing trial set for October 2, 2013 to a date to be announced by the Court when the Congressional budgetary issues are resolved. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 9/27/2013 (dtj)
February 10, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 Motion for adjudication of civil contempt. Plaintiff shall inform the Court how he wishes to proceed within 7 days. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 2/10/2015 (ECW)
March 4, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on March 4, 2015. (lda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solis v. Thompson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilda L. Solis
Represented By: Uche N. Egemonye
Represented By: Stanley E. Keen
Represented By: Robert L. Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thompson Tree and Spraying Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.