Ronaldo Designer Jewelry, Inc. v. Prinzo
Plaintiff: Ronaldo Designer Jewelry, Inc.
Defendant: Phillip Prinzo
Case Number: 5:2014cv00073
Filed: August 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Western Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: David C. Bramlette
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 110 Motion for Sanctions Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 8/8/2018 (ECW)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER - The Court orders the plaintiff to file a Response to the defendant's Medical Reports as a Restricted Document, so that the Court can decide how to proceed. The Response shall be filed within twenty (20) days from the date of entry of this Order. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 6/22/2018 (ECW)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the defendant, Phillip Prinzo, shall have forty (40) days to furnish the Court with Medical Reports from his physician or physicians for filing as a "Restricted Document." Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 5/17/2018 (ECW)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER re 110 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Ronaldo Designer Jewelry, Inc. The parties shall contact the Court, within 10 days from the date of entry of this Order, in order to set a date for the hearing regarding Ronaldo Designer Jewelry's Motion for Additional Sanctions. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 4/23/2018 (ECW)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER INCLUDING FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW re: hearing on damages of July 10, 2017. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 8/21/2017 (ECW)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting 91 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 99 Motion for Default Judgment; the parties are to contact the Court to schedule a hearing date to determine damages. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 5/10/2017 (ECW)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER denying without prejudice 95 Motion for Default Judgment Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 1/31/2017 (ECW)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER re 91 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ronaldo Designer Jewelry, Inc. The defendant, Phillip Prinzo, shall file his Response to the plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment within 10 days from the date of entry of this Order. Failure to file a timely response could result in Sanctions, as set forth in the Order. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 12/20/2016 (ECW)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER re 31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. The pro se defendant is reminded that his response to this motion must be filed with the Clerk of Court within 14 days of his receipt of the motion. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 2/5/2016 (ECW)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying without prejudice 22 Motion for Default Judgment Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 9/3/2015 (ECW)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 16 Motion to Strike Answer (document 9); adopting Report and Recommendations 19 . Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 6/12/2015 (ECW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ronaldo Designer Jewelry, Inc. v. Prinzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronaldo Designer Jewelry, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher A. Bates - PHV
Represented By: Kyle Anne Citrynell - PHV
Represented By: Alec M. Taylor
Represented By: Ellie Burnham Word
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Prinzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?